PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc. v. PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00960
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 REDACTED VERSION of #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Uebler, Thomas)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Rule 16 (b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/19/2019, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/18/2019. (nms)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #10 MOTION for Leave to File the Answer and Counterclaims Under Seal (see foot note in Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/11/2019. (nms)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent PFSA, Inc. for PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc. filed by PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Uebler, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 [SEALED] ANSWER to #2 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc., by PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Uebler, Thomas) Modified on 7/11/2019 (nms).
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File the Answer and Counterclaims Under Seal - filed by PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 7.1.1 Statement)(Uebler, Thomas) Modified on 7/11/2019 (nms).
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Travis J. Ferguson, Esq., regarding case status. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ferguson, Travis) Modified on 6/24/2019 (nms).
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORAL ORDER: Defendant's answer was due to be filed on 6/18/2019 (see D.I. #6 ), and to date none has been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/21/2019. (nms)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, by PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exibit A, #2 Exibit B, #3 Exibit C)(Kelly, Michael) Modified on 6/4/2019 (nms).
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc.. PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Kelly, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 28, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #1 MOTION For Leave to File Complaint and Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/28/2019. (nmg) Modified on 5/29/2019 (nms).
May 24, 2019 Remark : Exit copies to Duty Judge (MN). (rwc)
May 24, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc. on 5/24/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent SMS Holdings Corporation for PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc. filed by PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc. (rwc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed against PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2650605.) - filed by PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION For Leave to File Complaint and Exhibits Under Seal - filed by PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc. v. PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PrimeFlight Aviation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Travis John Ferguson
Represented By: Steven P. Wood
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?