Debro Siddiq Abdul-Akbar v. State of Delaware et al
Plaintiff: Debro Siddiq Abdul-Akbar
Defendant: Governor John Carney, Department of Justice, Mayor Michael S. Purzycki and State Of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2019cv00961
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to President Trump from Debro Siddiq Abdul-Akbar requesting federal injunctive relief and immediate federal intervention. (lak)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The motion for reconsideration of the order denying Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED (D.I. #5 ). The June 3, 2019 Order denying Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is VACATED (D.I. #4 ). Plaintiff's request to proceed informa pauperis is GRANTED (D.I. #1 ). Plaintiff's request for a change of venue is DENIED (D.I. #5 ). Plaintiff's request for a "new judge who is impartial and unbiased" is DENIED (D.I. #5 ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/12/2019. (amf)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration of D.I. #4 , MOTION for Recusal of Judge Stark, MOTION to Change Venue - filed by Debro Siddiq Abdul-Akbar. (lak)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, denying request to proceed informa pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30-days or the case shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/3/2019. (lak)
May 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Governor John Carney, Department of Justice, Mayor Michael S. Purzycki, and State Of Delaware - filed by Debro Siddiq Abdul-Akbar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Debro Siddiq Abdul-Akbar. (amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debro Siddiq Abdul-Akbar v. State of Delaware et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor John Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Michael S. Purzycki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debro Siddiq Abdul-Akbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?