Arbolay v. Vettori et al
Plaintiff: Angel Luis Arbolay
Defendant: SPO Bryan Vettori and Detective Patrick McAndrew
Case Number: 1:2019cv00976
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Partial Filing Fee Received from Angel Luis Arbolay: $ 288.05, receipt number DEX032119 (copy of receipt to business office). (lak)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Authorization by Angel Luis Arbolay requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office) (lak)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting D.I. #1 Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350 Assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $61.95 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form)( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 7/11/2019.) Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/11/2019. (myr)
June 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Patrick McAndrew, Bryan Vettori - filed by Angel Luis Arbolay.(ddp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Trust Fund Account Statement by Angel Luis Arbolay (ddp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Angel Luis Arbolay. (ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arbolay v. Vettori et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Luis Arbolay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPO Bryan Vettori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Patrick McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?