Murphy Marine Services, Inc. v. M/V ANGOL
Plaintiff: Murphy Marine Services, Inc.
Defendant: M/V ANGOL
Case Number: 1:2019cv00989
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00947-CFC, 1:19-cv-00989-CFC(nmf)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory Barnett filed by M/V ANGOL. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/18/2019. (fms)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory Barnett - filed by M/V ANGOL. (deBruin, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by M/V ANGOL. (deBruin, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by M/V ANGOL.(deBruin, David)
June 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
May 29, 2019 No Summons Issued. (myr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT filed against M/V ANGOL - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2653054.) - filed by Murphy Marine Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Letter to Clerk of the Court)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy Marine Services, Inc. v. M/V ANGOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murphy Marine Services, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur D. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V ANGOL
Represented By: David W. deBruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?