Young v. Chase Bank USA, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Kira Young
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Chase Bank USA, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01026
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Class Action Complaint filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Chase Bank USA, N.A. answer due 8/29/2019; JP Morgan Chase & Co. answer due 8/29/2019; JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 8/29/2019. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/8/2019. (mdb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Class Action Complaint - filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Tindall, Tyre)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER - Motions terminated: #4 MOTION for Protective Order and Expedited Discovery. Pursuant to #15 Stipulation Withdrawing Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order under Rule 23(d) and Expedited Discovery, the Motion is HEREBY TERMINATED. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/1/2019. (dlw)
June 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nicholas A. Migliaccio and Jason S. Rathod for Kira Young added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Withdrawing Plaintiff's Motion For A Protective Order Under Rule 23(d) And Expedited Discovery re #4 MOTION for Protective Order and Expedited Discovery by Kira Young. (deLeeuw, Peter)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint to July 29, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Chase Bank USA, N.A. answer due 7/29/2019; JP Morgan Chase & Co. answer due 7/29/2019; JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 7/29/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/25/2019. (dlw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint to July 29, 2019 - filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Tindall, Tyre)
June 20, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alan E. Schoenfeld,Stephanie Simon for Chase Bank USA, N.A., for JP Morgan Chase & Co., for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alan Schoenfeld and Stephanie Simon filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/19/2019. (dlw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alan Schoenfeld and Stephanie Simon - filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Tindall, Tyre)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Tindall, Tyre)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyre L. Tindall on behalf of All Defendants (Tindall, Tyre)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Fineman on behalf of All Defendants (Fineman, Steven)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathrine G. Dearlove on behalf of All Defendants (Dearlove, Cathrine)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey Kaliel and Sophia Gold filed by Kira Young. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/17/2019. (dlw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey Kaliel and Sophia Gold - filed by Kira Young. (Attachments: #1 PHV Certification (Jeffrey Kaliel), #2 PHV Certification (Sophia Gold))(deLeeuw, Peter)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order Under Rule 23(d) and Expedited Discovery; Plaintiff's Opening Brief in Support of Her Motion for a Protective Order Under Rule 23(d) and Expedited Discovery; and Declaration of Kira Young by Kira Young re #5 Opening Brief in Support, #4 MOTION for Protective Order and Expedited Discovery, #6 Declaration (deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 6/17/2019 (dlw).
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Kira Young re #5 Opening Brief in Support, #4 MOTION for Protective Order and Expedited Discovery by Kira Young. (deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 6/17/2019 (dlw).
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #4 MOTION for Protective Order and Expedited Discovery filed by Kira Young. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/28/2019. (deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 6/17/2019 (dlw).
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Protective Order and Expedited Discovery - filed by Kira Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification of Counsel Pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1)(deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 6/17/2019 (dlw).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicholas A. Migliaccio and Jason S. Rathod filed by Kira Young. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/14/2019. (dlw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicholas A. Migliaccio and Jason S. Rathod - filed by Kira Young. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Certification of Nicholas Migliaccio, #2 Pro Hac Vice Certification of Jason Rathod)(deLeeuw, Peter)
June 6, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Chase Bank USA, N.A. on 6/6/2019; JP Morgan Chase & Co. on 6/6/2019; JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. on 6/6/2019. (ddp)
June 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
June 3, 2019 No Summons Issued. (lak)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2655980.) - filed by Kira Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Chase Bank USA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Stephanie Simon
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld
Represented By: Tyre L. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Stephanie Simon
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld
Represented By: Tyre L. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Stephanie Simon
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Represented By: Cathrine G. Dearlove
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld
Represented By: Tyre L. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kira Young
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?