Garfield v. Lebovitz et al
Plaintiff: Robert Garfield and Robert Cohen
Defendant: Stephen D. Lebovitz, Kathleen M. Nelson, John D. Griffith, A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Matthew S. Dominski and Richard J. Lieb
Nominal Defendant: CBL & Associates Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01038
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 Joint STIPULATION Staying Case Pending Resolution of the Motions to Dismiss in the Related Securities Class Actions -- Case Stayed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/24/19. (ntl)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STIPULATION Staying Case Pending Resolution of the Motions to Dismiss in the Related Securities Class Actions re #1 Complaint, #5 Stipulation, by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Matthew S. Dominski, John D. Griffith, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz, Richard J. Lieb, Kathleen M. Nelson. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (4 in 1:19-cv-01185-LPS, 5 in 1:19-cv-01038-LPS) Joint STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Establishing A Leadership Structure. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/17/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01038-LPS, 1:19-cv-01185-LPS (ntl)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Beth A. Keller filed by Robert Garfield. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/9/19. (ntl)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Joint STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Establishing A Leadership Structure by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Matthew S. Dominski, John D. Griffith, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz, Richard J. Lieb, Kathleen M. Nelson, CBL & Associates Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick DiTomo on behalf of CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Matthew S. Dominski, John D. Griffith, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz, Richard J. Lieb, Kathleen M. Nelson, CBL & Associates Properties, Inc. (DiTomo, John)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Beth A. Keller - filed by Robert Garfield. (Bennett, Blake)
June 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 4, 2019 No Summons Issued. (myr)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Matthew S. Dominski, John D. Griffith, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz, Richard J. Lieb, Kathleen M. Nelson - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2657419.) - filed by Robert Garfield. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garfield v. Lebovitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D. Lebovitz
Represented By: John Patrick DiTomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M. Nelson
Represented By: John Patrick DiTomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Griffith
Represented By: John Patrick DiTomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Larry Chapman
Represented By: John Patrick DiTomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farzana Khaleel
Represented By: John Patrick DiTomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles B. Lebovitz
Represented By: John Patrick DiTomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew S. Dominski
Represented By: John Patrick DiTomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Lieb
Represented By: John Patrick DiTomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: CBL & Associates Properties, Inc.
Represented By: John Patrick DiTomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Garfield
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cohen
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?