Ownum, LLC v. Ownum, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ownum, LLC
Defendant: Ownum, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01043
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Duces Tecum on Tucows, Inc. filed by Ownum, LLC.(Harmon, Kate)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 Letter - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff may pursue limited discovery related to the ownership of the Domain Name "ownum.com" and issue a subpoena directed to Tucows, Inc. in substantially the same form as the subpoena attached as Exhibit A to D.I. #8 . Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/16/2019. (dlw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER Request to Conduct Limited Discovery re #8 Letter by Ownum, LLC. (Harmon, Kate)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Kate Harmon regarding Request for Limited Discovery as to Owner of the Domain Name Ownum.com. (Harmon, Kate)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER re #6 Letter - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's request "to conduct some very limited discovery" is DENIED without prejudice to renew. With Plaintiff's renewed request, it shall provide to the Court a copy of "this subpoena" and any attachments along with relevant case law that supports Plaintiff's request. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/3/2019. (dlw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Kate Harmon regarding Lack of Response to Complaint - re #1 Complaint. (Harmon, Kate)
June 20, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James B. Niehaus for Ownum, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 12, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Ownum, Inc. answer due 6/27/2019. (dlw)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James B. Niehaus filed by Ownum, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/12/2019. (dlw)
June 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Ownum, Inc. on 06/06/2019, filed by Ownum, LLC. (Hoover, Jennifer)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James B. Niehaus - filed by Ownum, LLC. (Hoover, Jennifer)
June 6, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Ownum, Inc. on 6/6/2019. (nmg)
June 5, 2019 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 87/938,800. (nmg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Ownum, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2658600.) - filed by Ownum, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ownum, LLC v. Ownum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ownum, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer R. Hoover
Represented By: Kate Harmon
Represented By: James B. Niehaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ownum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?