Pretko v. Saul

Plaintiff: Melissa A. Pretko
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01069
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of the referral order at D.I. #5 has been replaced with the correct pdf. (nmf)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/29/2019. (nmf) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/29/2019) (nmf, ).
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Benderson, Heather)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Chermol filed by Melissa A. Pretko. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/12/2019. (fms)
June 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Chermol - filed by Melissa A. Pretko. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Linarducci, Gary)
June 10, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General on 6/10/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Commissioner of Social Security - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2661090.) - filed by Melissa A. Pretko. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pretko v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa A. Pretko
Represented By: Gary C. Linarducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?