Hallinan v. Whetstone Partners, LLC
Plaintiff: Linda B. Hallinan
Defendant: Whetstone Partners, LLC
Intervenor: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01079
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Time to File Reply to August 21, 2019 (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #7 MOTION to Intervene. Reply Brief due 8/21/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2019. (nms)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Time to File Reply to August 21, 2019 - filed by United States of America. (Wolf, Lesley)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss, and in the Alternative to Stay Proceedings filed by Linda B. Hallinan.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Orlacchio, Adam)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #7 Motion to Intervene, filed by Linda B. Hallinan.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Orlacchio, Adam) Modified on 7/31/2019 (nms).
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Whetstone Holdings, LLC for Whetstone Partners, LLC filed by Whetstone Partners, LLC. (Malik, John)
July 24, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 14 has been removed from the docket. The proposed order filed at that entry has been added to the filing at D.I. #12 . (nms)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss, and in the Alternative to Stay Proceedings, filed by Whetstone Partners, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Malik, John) Modified on 7/24/2019 (nms).
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss, and in the Alternative to Stay Proceedings - filed by Whetstone Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Malik, John) Modified on 7/24/2019 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (nms).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Roma W. Theus, II, Esq., filed by Whetstone Partners, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/18/2019. (nms)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Roma W. Theus, II, Esquire - filed by Whetstone Partners, LLC. (Malik, John)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to oppose or otherwise respond to Motion to Intervene (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #7 MOTION to Intervene. Answering Brief due 7/31/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/15/2019. (nms)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to oppose or otherwise respond to the United States' Motion to Intervene to July 31, 2019 - filed by Linda B. Hallinan. (Orlacchio, Adam) Modified on 7/17/2019 (nms).
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 7.1.1 STATEMENT re #7 MOTION to Intervene, by United States of America. (Hatcher, Laura) Modified on 7/12/2019 (nms).
July 12, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The statement filed at D.I. 9 has been removed from the docket per counsel's request. An updated 7.1.1 Statement will be refiled shortly. (nms)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Intervene filed by United States of America.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Wolf, Lesley)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene - filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolf, Lesley)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Answer or Other Response to the Complaint to July 23, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Whetstone Partners, LLC answer due 07/23/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/2/2019. (nms)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint to July 23, 2019 - filed by Whetstone Partners, LLC. (Malik, John)
July 2, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The motion filed at D.I. 6 has been removed from the docket per counsel's request. (nms)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Malik on behalf of Whetstone Partners, LLC (Malik, John)
June 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lance Rogers for Linda B. Hallinan added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lance Rogers, filed by Linda B. Hallinan. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2019. (nms)
June 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda B. Hallinan. Whetstone Partners, LLC served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Orlacchio, Adam)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lance Rogers - filed by Linda B. Hallinan. (Orlacchio, Adam)
June 11, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Whetstone Partners, LLC on 6/11/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF - filed against Whetstone Partners, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2662156) - filed by Linda B. Hallinan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hallinan v. Whetstone Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda B. Hallinan
Represented By: Adam V. Orlacchio
Represented By: Lance Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whetstone Partners, LLC
Represented By: John S. Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States of America
Represented By: Lesley F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?