Wheby v. Electronics For Imaging, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Earl M. Wheby, Jr.
Defendant: Richard Kashnow, Gill Cogan, Eric Brown, Electronics For Imaging, Inc., Bill Muir, Janice Durbin Chaffin, Dan Maydan, Guy Gecht and Tom Georgens
Case Number: 1:2019cv01094
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #12 . (dlw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Earl M. Wheby, Jr (Long, Brian)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr: For Gill Cogan waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Long, Brian)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr: For Janice Durbin Chaffin waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Long, Brian)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr: For Eric Brown waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Long, Brian)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr: For Bill Muir waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Long, Brian)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr: For Dan Maydan waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Long, Brian)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr: For Richard Kashnow waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Long, Brian)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr: For Tom Georgens waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Long, Brian)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr: For Guy Gecht waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Long, Brian)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr: For Electronics For Imaging, Inc. waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Long, Brian)
June 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 14, 2019 No Summons Issued. (amf)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 - filed with Jury Demand against Eric Brown, Janice Durbin Chaffin, Gill Cogan, Electronics For Imaging, Inc., Guy Gecht, Tom Georgens, Richard Kashnow, Dan Maydan, and Bill Muir - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2664723) - filed by Earl M. Wheby, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheby v. Electronics For Imaging, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kashnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gill Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronics For Imaging, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Durbin Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Maydan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Gecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Georgens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl M. Wheby, Jr.
Represented By: Brian D. Long
Represented By: Gina M. Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?