Evans v. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association et al
Plaintiff: Veronica Evans
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Capital One Bank (USA), National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv01104
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to August 15, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/17/19. (ntl)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to August 15, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement as to Capital One Bank (USA), National Association Only by Veronica Evans (Garibian, Antranig)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Evans. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Capital One Bank (USA), National Association on 6/24/2019, filed by Veronica Evans. (Garibian, Antranig)
June 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Capital One Bank (USA), National Association on 6/17/2019; Equifax Information Services, LLC on 6/17/2019. (Summons mailed to counsel's Philadelphia office) (nmg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Capital One Bank (USA), National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2665556.) - filed by Veronica Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Evans
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?