Cohn v. SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Cohn
Defendant: Fay West, John W. Somerhalder II, Michael G. Rippey, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Robert A. Peiser, SunCoke Energy Partners GP, LLC, Peter B. Hamilton, P. Michael Hardesty, John W. Rowe, SunCoke Energy, Inc., Katherine T. Gates, Susan R. Landahl, James E. Sweetnam, Martha Carnes and Alvin Bledsoe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01107
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:19-cv-00693-CFC. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 19-693-CFC ONLY. (nmf)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting (46) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (46) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:19-cv-00693-CFC; granting (9) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (9) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:19-cv-01055-CFC; granting (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (21) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:19-cv-01107-CFC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/31/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00693-CFC, 1:19-cv-01055-CFC, 1:19-cv-01107-CFC(nmf)
July 29, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Counsel by Michael Cohn re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Consolidation, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, and Appointment of Lead Counsel, Opening Brief, and Declaration by Michael Cohn (Van Gorder, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Cohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Van Gorder, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Michael Cohn.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Michael Cohn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Gorder, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Michael Cohn re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Telephone Conference held on 6/24/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00693-CFC, 1:19-cv-01107-CFC(fms)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Parker Will on behalf of Peter B. Hamilton, Susan R. Landahl, Robert A. Peiser, John W. Rowe, SunCoke Energy Partners GP, LLC, SunCoke Energy, Inc., James E. Sweetnam (Will, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James M. Wilson for Michael Cohn added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David D. Sterling, Paul R. Elliott and Matthew B. Allen of Baker Botts L.L.P. filed by Fay West, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Katherine T. Gates, Martha Carnes, Alvin Bledsoe, John W. Somerhalder II. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/24/2019. (fms)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent SunCoke Energy, Inc. for SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P. filed by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West. (Walsh, Peter)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David D. Sterling, Paul R. Elliott and Matthew B. Allen of Baker Botts L.L.P. - filed by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West. (Silverstein, Alan)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert W. Killorin of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP filed by Michael Cohn, #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James M. Wilson, Jr. of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP filed by Michael Cohn. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/24/2019. (fms)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert W. Killorin of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP - filed by Michael Cohn. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James M. Wilson, Jr. of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP - filed by Michael Cohn. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for plaintiffs to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 6/24/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/21/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01107-CFC, 1:19-cv-00693-CFC(nmf)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Order re #7 Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by Michael Cohn. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Cohn: For Katherine T. Gates waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Cohn: For Fay West waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Cohn: For Alvin Bledsoe waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Cohn: For P. Michael Hardesty waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Cohn: For Michael G. Rippey waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Cohn: For SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P. waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, on or before the close of business tomorrow, June 21, 2019, counsel for the plaintiff shall advise the Court as to the extent of coordination possible between the two cases and if a separate conference with the Court is needed. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/21/2019.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/20/2019. (nmf)
June 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 19, 2019 Remark : Judge Connolly's chambers notified per DI#'s 3 & 4. (rwc)
June 18, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to office per filing party's request. (myr)
June 18, 2019 Remark : Case submitted to Duty Judge (MN), although expedited handling was not specified. (rwc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of by Michael Cohn re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 Opening Brief in Support, #5 Declaration (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael Cohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Van Gorder, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael Cohn.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Michael Cohn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Gorder, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Alvin Bledsoe on 6/17/2019; Martha Carnes on 6/17/2019; Katherine T. Gates on 6/17/2019; Peter B. Hamilton on 6/17/2019; P. Michael Hardesty on 6/17/2019; Susan R. Landahl on 6/17/2019; Robert A. Peiser on 6/17/2019; Michael G. Rippey on 6/17/2019; John W. Rowe on 6/17/2019; John W. Somerhalder II on 6/17/2019; SunCoke Energy Partners GP, LLC on 6/17/2019; SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P. on 6/17/2019; SunCoke Energy, Inc. on 6/17/2019; James E. Sweetnam on 6/17/2019; Fay West on 6/17/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, Peter B. Hamilton, P. Michael Hardesty, Susan R. Landahl, Robert A. Peiser, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Rowe, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners GP, LLC, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., SunCoke Energy, Inc., James E. Sweetnam, Fay West - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2665700.) - filed by Michael Cohn. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohn v. SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay West
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Somerhalder II
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Rippey
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Peiser
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: S. Mark Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunCoke Energy Partners GP, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: S. Mark Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter B. Hamilton
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: S. Mark Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Michael Hardesty
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Rowe
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: S. Mark Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunCoke Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: S. Mark Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine T. Gates
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan R. Landahl
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: S. Mark Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Sweetnam
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: S. Mark Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Carnes
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Bledsoe
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cohn
Represented By: Michael D. Van Gorder
Represented By: James M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?