Crown Cell Inc. v. Qardio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Crown Cell Inc.
Defendant: Qardio, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01184
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 4,971,993. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(fms)
July 22, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #7 . (fms)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Crown Cell Inc. as to the Complaint without Prejudice (Fry, Katherine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crown Cell Inc.. Qardio, Inc. served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Fry, Katherine)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Coby S. Nixon, Esquire filed by Crown Cell Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/27/2019. (nmf)
June 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Coby S. Nixon, Esquire - filed by Crown Cell Inc.. (Fry, Katherine)
June 24, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Qardio, Inc. on 6/24/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ddp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Crown Cell Inc.. (ddp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 4,971,993. (ddp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Qardio, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2671641.) - filed by Crown Cell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crown Cell Inc. v. Qardio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crown Cell Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Randolph Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qardio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?