Dunkin Donuts Franchising LLC et al v. Hockessin Donuts LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dunkin Donuts Franchising LLC and DD IP Holder LLC
Defendant: Longwood Donuts, Inc., Kenneth Larsen, Bear Donuts, LLC, Hockessin Donuts LLC, Millcreek Donuts, L.L.C., Fox Run Donuts, LLC, New Castle Donuts, L.L.C., Elsmere Donuts, L.L.C., Thomas Sheehan, Concord Donuts, Inc. and Trolley Square Donuts, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01186
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #6 . (dlw)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin Donuts Franchising LLC as to all defendants (England, Margaret)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric L. Yaffe, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maisa J. Frank filed by Dunkin Donuts Franchising LLC, DD IP Holder LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/27/2019. (dlw)
June 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maisa J. Frank - filed by DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin Donuts Franchising LLC. (England, Margaret)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric L. Yaffe - filed by DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin Donuts Franchising LLC. (England, Margaret)
June 24, 2019 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dunkin Brands Group, Inc. for DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin Donuts Franchising LLC filed by DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin Donuts Franchising LLC. (nmg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Bear Donuts, LLC, Concord Donuts, Inc., Elsmere Donuts, L.L.C., Fox Run Donuts, LLC, Hockessin Donuts LLC, Kenneth Larsen, Longwood Donuts, Inc., Millcreek Donuts, L.L.C., New Castle Donuts, L.L.C., Thomas Sheehan, Trolley Square Donuts, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2671680.) - filed by DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin Donuts Franchising LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunkin Donuts Franchising LLC et al v. Hockessin Donuts LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longwood Donuts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Donuts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hockessin Donuts LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millcreek Donuts, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Run Donuts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Castle Donuts, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsmere Donuts, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concord Donuts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trolley Square Donuts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dunkin Donuts Franchising LLC
Represented By: Margaret Fleming England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DD IP Holder LLC
Represented By: Margaret Fleming England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?