Earth Pipeline Services, Inc. v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Plaintiff: Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Counter Defendant: Earth Pipleline Services, Inc.
Debtor: Welded Construction, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01210
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Remark: Copies of the Order Transferring the Cases to Bankruptcy Court mailed to counsel at the addresses listed on the local counsel letter. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01210-CFC, 1:19-cv-01211-CFC(nmf)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Transferring Cases to the District of Delaware Bankruptcy Court, CASES CLOSED. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/15/2019. (nmf)
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01210-CFC, 1:19-cv-01211-CFC (rjb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 7/26/2019. (lak)
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 Record of case transferred in from District of West Virginia Northern; Case Number in Other District: 5:19-cv-00172. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 26, 2019 Case transferred to District of Delaware. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The #11 Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC ("Columbia") is GRANTED IN PART and Plaintiff, Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.'s #13 Motion for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of May 21, 2019 Order of Court is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/26/19. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #12 Stipulation, #4 Answer to Complaint Extending Time to Respond to Counterclaim by Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.. (Zamosky, Arthur) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #10 Order on Public Motion, and/or Clarification of Order of Court filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EPS Discovery)(Meadows, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Meadows, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue filed by Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.. (Zamosky, Arthur) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Order re #13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #10 Order on Public Motion, and/or Clarification of Order of Court by Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.. (Zamosky, Arthur) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #10 Order on Public Motion, and/or Clarification of Order of Court by Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.. (Zamosky, Arthur) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Counterclaim by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Meadows, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Meadows, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #6 MOTION FOR REMAND OR ABSTENTION. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/21/19. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 6/25/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/5/2019. Discovery due by 7/19/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/21/19. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/14/19. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET SHEET. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF, EARTH PIPELINE SERVICES, INC.'S, MOTION FOR REMAND OR ABSTENTION by Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 PLAINTIFFS FED. R. BANKR. P. 9027(e)(3) STATEMENT. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE filed by USBC. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE filed by USBC. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL , filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC.(lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 6/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earth Pipeline Services, Inc. v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Earth Pipleline Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earth Pipeline Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Welded Construction, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?