EIS Inc. v. WOW Tech International GmbH et al
Plaintiff: EIS Inc.
Defendant: Novoluto GmbH, WOW Tech USA, Ltd., WOW Tech International GmbH and WOW Tech Canada, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01227
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 10/2/2019 filed by Novoluto GmbH, WOW Tech USA, Ltd., WOW Tech Canada, Ltd., WOW Tech International GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/24/19. (ntl)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 10/2/2019 - filed by Novoluto GmbH, WOW Tech Canada, Ltd., WOW Tech International GmbH, WOW Tech USA, Ltd.. (Farnan, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Farnan on behalf of Novoluto GmbH, WOW Tech Canada, Ltd., WOW Tech International GmbH, WOW Tech USA, Ltd. (Farnan, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Farnan on behalf of Novoluto GmbH, WOW Tech Canada, Ltd., WOW Tech International GmbH, WOW Tech USA, Ltd. (Farnan, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by EIS Inc.. WOW Tech Canada, Ltd. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EIS Inc.. WOW Tech USA, Ltd. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 28, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Novoluto GmbH on 6/28/2019; WOW Tech Canada, Ltd. on 6/28/2019; WOW Tech International GmbH on 6/28/2019; WOW Tech USA, Ltd. on 6/28/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent EIS GmbH for EIS Inc. filed by EIS Inc. (nmg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Novoluto GmbH, WOW Tech Canada, Ltd., WOW Tech International GmbH, WOW Tech USA, Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2675529.) - filed by EIS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EIS Inc. v. WOW Tech International GmbH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novoluto GmbH
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOW Tech USA, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOW Tech International GmbH
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOW Tech Canada, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIS Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?