LBT IP I LLC v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: LBT IP I LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01245
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against LBT IP I LLC by Apple Inc..(Moore, David)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 26, 2019 filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/9/19. (ntl)
September 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Anne M. Cappella, Brian E. Ferguson, Robert T. Vlasis, III for Apple Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 26, 2019 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian E. Ferguson, Robert T. Vlasis III, Daniel Musher, Ariane Moss, Audra Sawyer, Anne M. Cappella, and Sudip Kundu of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/6/19. (ntl)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian E. Ferguson, Robert T. Vlasis III, Daniel Musher, Ariane Moss, Audra Sawyer, Anne M. Cappella, and Sudip Kundu of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP - filed by Apple Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 12, 2019 filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/19. (ntl)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 12, 2019 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LBT IP I LLC. Apple Inc. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Pascale, Karen)
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 1, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Apple Inc. on 7/1/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent LBT IP LLC for LBT IP I LLC filed by LBT IP I LLC. (myr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,497,774 B2 ;US 8,542,113 B2 ;US 8,102,256 B2 ;US 8,421,618 B2 ;US 8,421,619 B2. (myr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2677196.) - filed by LBT IP I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LBT IP I LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LBT IP I LLC
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Brian E. Ferguson
Represented By: Robert T. Vlasis, III
Represented By: Anne M. Cappella
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?