Davis v. JP Morgan Chase
Plaintiff: Demetrias Davis
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase
Case Number: 1:2019cv01250
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE per D.I. #5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Demetrias Davis (copy to pltf.) (CASE CLOSED) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/20/2019. (nmf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Demetrias Davis. (mal)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, denying request to proceed informa pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30-days or the case shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/15/2019. (lak)
July 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT - filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against JP Morgan Chase - filed by Demetrias Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Demetrias Davis. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. JP Morgan Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrias Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?