Zutell v. Maduka et al
Plaintiff: John Kevin Zutell
Defendant: Connections Community Support Programs Inc. and Dr. Awele Maduka
Case Number: 1:2019cv01254
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form)( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/14/2019.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/15/2019. (lak)
July 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT - filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Connections Community Support Programs Inc., Awele Maduka - filed by John Kevin Zutell. (lak)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by John Kevin Zutell. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zutell v. Maduka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connections Community Support Programs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Awele Maduka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kevin Zutell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?