Dish Network L.L.C. v. Serverlogy Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Dish Network L.L.C.
Defendant: Does 1-5 and Serverlogy Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01262
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/16/2019, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/29/2019. (nms)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William P. Foley, Esq., filed by Serverlogy Corporation, #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karl W. Roth, Esq., filed by Serverlogy Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/23/2019. (nms)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William P. Foley, Esq. - filed by Serverlogy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tobia, James)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karl W. Roth, Esq. - filed by Serverlogy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tobia, James)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Serverlogy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tobia, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James Tobia on behalf of Serverlogy Corporation (Tobia, James)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen M. Ferguson, filed by Dish Network L.L.C.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/111/2019. (nms)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen M. Ferguson - filed by Dish Network L.L.C.. (Smith, Rodger)
July 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s) - See attached Ex. A; . (Smith, Rodger)
July 9, 2019 Remark : Counsel is reminded to file an AO Form 121 Copyright Form in the case and mail a hard copy to the Copyright Office. (rwc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dish Network L.L.C.. Serverlogy Corporation served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Smith, Rodger)
July 8, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Serverlogy Corporation on 7/8/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dish Network Corporation for Dish Network L.L.C. filed by Dish Network L.L.C.. (amf)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Does 1-5 and Serverlogy Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2680264) - filed by Dish Network L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dish Network L.L.C. v. Serverlogy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dish Network L.L.C.
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serverlogy Corporation
Represented By: James Tobia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?