Maiorano v. Saul
Plaintiff: Joann Maiorano
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01265
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Benderson, Heather)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Chermol filed by Joann Maiorano. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/11/19. (ntl)
July 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Chermol - filed by Joann Maiorano. (Linarducci, Gary)
July 9, 2019 Remark : Summonses mailed to Plaintiff's counsel per their request. (rwc)
July 9, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to the Commissioner of Social Security (Philadelphia Regional Office), U.S. Attorney for the District of Delaware and U.S. Attorney General. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Good Standing Received for David F. Chermol - (Not Required. Local Counsel shall file a Motion for Pro-Hac Vice to formally enter Mr. Chermol's appearance in this action). (rwc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed against Andrew M. Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2680445.) - filed by Joann Maiorano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maiorano v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Maiorano
Represented By: Gary C. Linarducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?