Burke v. Saul
Plaintiff: Sharron Michelle Burke
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01288
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Benderson, Heather)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Within fourteen (14) days from the entry of this Order, an entry ofappearance shall be filed identifying the Special Assistant United States Attorney who will appear to defend the Commissioner of Social Security. Within ninety (90) days from filing the entry of appearance, the Acting Commissioner of Social Security shall serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and shall also file the transcript of Social Security proceedings. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/16/2019. (lak)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER- Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (long form application) (D.I. 6) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 08/13/2019. (mal)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Sharron Michelle Burke. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(myr)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/29/2019. (nmf)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff shall submit IFP long form application, form AO 239 or pay in full the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to submit items within 21 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/13/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/23/2019. (amf)
July 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed against Nancy A. Berryhill - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Sharron Michelle Burke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(amf)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Sharron Michelle Burke. (amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharron Michelle Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?