Power Integrations, Inc. v. Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Power Integrations, Inc.
Defendant: Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01292
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/17/2019. (Rovner, Philip)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 3, 2019 filed by Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/19. (ntl)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 3, 2019 - filed by Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
July 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David J. Miclean,Limin Zheng for Power Integrations, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J. Miclean and Limin Zheng filed by Power Integrations, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/22/19. (ntl)
July 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J. Miclean and Limin Zheng - filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Power Integrations, Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Keller, Karen)
July 11, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc. on 7/11/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (amf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2683110) - filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Compliance D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Integrations, Inc. v. Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc.
Represented By: Philip A. Rovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Power Integrations, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: David J. Miclean
Represented By: Limin Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?