Nederland Shipping Corporation et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Nederland Shipping Corporation and Chartworld Shipping Corporation
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01302
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Remark: Miscellaneous action 19-175-RGA no longer exists as that case has been converted into the present civil action. (nms)
July 12, 2019 Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number 32063 (rwc)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case was improperly filed as a Miscellaneous Action on July 8, 2019. The Clerk of Court shall convert Miscellaneous Action 19-175-RGA into a Civil Action using the next available civil action number. The Court will take no action regarding this matter until the remainder of the $400.00 filing fee is paid by Nederland Shipping Corporation and Chartworld Shipping Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/12/2019. (nms)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause - filed by Chartworld Shipping Corporation, Nederland Shipping Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seelaus, Anne)
July 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED ORDER re #1 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, by Chartworld Shipping Corporation, Nederland Shipping Corporation. (Seelaus, Anne) Modified on 7/10/2019 (nms).
July 9, 2019 Remark : Case submitted for routine judicial case assignment absent the filing of a Motion or Letter for Expedited Handling. (rwc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Declaratory Relief - filed by Chartworld Shipping Corporation, Nederland Shipping Corporation. (Miscellaneous Filing Fee $47.00 Paid. Receipt No.: 0311-2680595) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nederland Shipping Corporation et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nederland Shipping Corporation
Represented By: Anne Kai Seelaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chartworld Shipping Corporation
Represented By: Anne Kai Seelaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?