Wells v. SLM Corporation

Plaintiff: Alainna Wells
Defendant: SLM Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01308
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 9/18/2019 at 10:00 AM Eastern Time before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/6/19. (cak)
August 26, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 10/4/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2019. Fact Discovery completed by 3/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/17/2020. A Pretrial Conference is set for 11/13/2020, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 3 day Jury Trial is set to begin 11/30/2020, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/26/2019. (nms)
August 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 8/26/2019. Local counsel present for plaintiff: T. Holly, L. DeLuca. Local counsel present for defendant: D. Shauger. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) (crb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Alainna Wells. (DeLuca, Lauren) Modified on 8/23/2019 (nms).
August 23, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The proposed order filed at D.I. 8 has been removed from the docket as it was filed as a motion. Counsel is to re-file the proposed order using the "Proposed Order" filing event code. (nms)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/26/2019, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2019. (nms)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clark Whitney, filed by SLM Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2019. (nms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clark Whitney - filed by SLM Corporation. (Shauger, Dean)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by SLM Corporation. (Shauger, Dean)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SLM Corporation.(Shauger, Dean)
July 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alainna Wells. SLM Corporation served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (DeLuca, Lauren)
July 15, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to SLM Corporation on 7/15/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against SLM Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf.( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2684930.) - filed by Alainna Wells.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. SLM Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLM Corporation
Represented By: Dean J. Shauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alainna Wells
Represented By: Lauren Patrice DeLuca
Represented By: Timothy Michael Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?