Kennedy v. The United States Courts et al
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas Kennedy
Defendant: Leonard P. Stark, The United States Courts, Richard G. Andrews and John Glover Roberts
Case Number: 1:2019cv01311
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE and OBJECTION re D.I. #11 Order - filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (amf)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 , Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is denied. (D.I. #8 ). Plaintiff is given thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to pay the $400.00 filing fee. If the filing fee is not paid within that time, the Complaint shall be dismissed without prejudice and closed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/22/2019. (lak)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/22/2019. (lak)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re D.I. #8 MOTION for Reconsideration re D.I. #6 Order Denying IFP filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/16/2019. (myr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re D.I. #6 Order Denying IFP - filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (myr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE and OBJECTION by Edward Thomas Kennedy re D.I. #6 Order Denying IFP (myr)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - denying request to proceed informa pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30-days or the case shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/23/2019. (amf)
July 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 15, 2019 Remark: Summons received and placed in case file pending service order. (amf)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Service of Process - filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(amf)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Authorization to File Electronically - filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(amf)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Richard G. Andrews, John Glover Roberts, Leonard P. Stark, and The United States Courts - filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Notice re corruption, #4 Notice re judge assignment, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. The United States Courts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard P. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Glover Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?