Noblr, Inc. v. Nobl Insurance LLC
Plaintiff: Noblr, Inc.
Defendant: Nobl Insurance LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01314
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 24 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 8/28/2019 before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dale C. Hawkins,Telephone number 573-6196. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2019. (dh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admission filed by Nobl Insurance LLC.(Anthony, David)
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Noblr, Inc's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Nobl Insurance LLC (Nos. 1-5) (Preliminary Injunction Discovery); Plaintiff Noblr, Inc's First Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Nobl Insurance LLC (Nos. 1-10) (Preliminary Injunction Discovery); and Plaintiff Noblr, Inc's First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Nobl Insurance LLC (Nos. 1-15) (Preliminary Injunction Discovery) filed by Noblr, Inc..(Pascale, Karen)
September 11, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The duplicative filing of D.I. #21 has been deleted and the main pdf of D.I. #21 has been replaced with the correct version of the document. It is requested that counsel refrain from attempting to correct a deficiency without the assistance of the clerks office. (lih)
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Nobl Insurance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Anthony, David) (Main Document 21 replaced on 9/11/2019) (lih). Modified on 9/11/2019 (nms).
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER- re #19 Proposed Order regarding Preliminary Injunction Scheduling and Discovery. Set Briefing Schedule: re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Answering Brief due 9/10/2019., Pre-Hearing Brief due 10/25/2019., Defendant's Pre-Hearing Brief due 11/1/2019.) An Oral Argument is set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint proposed protective order on or before 9/13/2019 governing discovery related to the preliminary injunction issue. (PLEASE REFER TO ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/6/2019. (lih)
September 4, 2019 Filing 19 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Karen L. Pascale regarding Preliminary Injunction Scheduling and Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pascale, Karen) Modified on 9/5/2019 (lih).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles E. Phipps. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/4/2019. (lih)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule on or before 8/28/2019. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/28/2019. (lih)
August 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 8/28/2019. (Court Reporter D. Hawkins.) (lih)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cyber-Insur Holding Company, LLC for Nobl Insurance LLC filed by Nobl Insurance LLC. (Anthony, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles E. Phipps, Esquire - filed by Nobl Insurance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification By Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Anthony, David)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ann G. Fort, Christopher J. Chan and Anna C. Halsey. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/23/2019. (lih)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ann G. Fort, Christopher J. Chan and Anna C. Halsey - filed by Noblr, Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Pascale, Karen)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 REDACTED VERSION of #10 Declaration by Noblr, Inc.. (Pascale, Karen)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 REDACTED VERSION of #9 Opening Brief in Support by Noblr, Inc.. (Pascale, Karen)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #13 Letter Request. A Telephone Conference is set for 8/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/21/2019. (lih)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon, from Karen L. Pascale, regarding Conference to Discuss Preliminary Injunction. (Pascale, Karen) Modified on 8/21/2019 (nms).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORAL ORDER: The case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for all purposes through the case dispositive motion deadline. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/21/2019. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(nms) Modified on 8/21/2019 (nms).
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Anna C. Halsey re #9 Opening Brief in Support, by Noblr, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-9)(Pascale, Karen) Modified on 8/21/2019 (nms).
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Gary C. Tolman re #9 Opening Brief in Support, by Noblr, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I)(Pascale, Karen) Modified on 8/21/2019 (nms).
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Noblr, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/3/2019. (Pascale, Karen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Noblr, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pascale, Karen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Nobl Insurance LLC.(McDermott, Michael)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Disclosure Statement Pursuant to 7.1: Identifying White Mountains Capital, Inc., filed by Noblr, Inc. (Pascale, Karen) Modified on 7/24/2019 (nms).
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noblr, Inc.. Nobl Insurance LLC served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Pascale, Karen)
July 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 16, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Nobl Insurance LLC on 7/16/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Hudson Capital Management Funds, Other Affiliate White Mountains Capital, Inc. for Noblr, Inc. filed by Noblr, Inc.. (myr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,758,565. (myr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Nobl Insurance LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 3112686226.) - filed by Noblr, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noblr, Inc. v. Nobl Insurance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noblr, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nobl Insurance LLC
Represented By: Michael William McDermott
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?