Mangiaracina v. JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Paula Mangiaracina
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01318
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement Equifax Information Services, LLC Only by Paula Mangiaracina (Garibian, Antranig)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to September 13, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 9/13/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/14/2019. (fms)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to September 13, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paula Mangiaracina. JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paula Mangiaracina. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
July 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
July 16, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to Philadelphia Office per filing party's request. (myr)
July 16, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 7/16/2019; JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC on 7/16/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2686816.) - filed by Paula Mangiaracina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mangiaracina v. JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Mangiaracina
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?