Principal Growth Strategies, LLC et al v. AGH Parent LLC et al
Plaintiff: Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund L.P., Martin Trott & Christopher Smith and Principal Growth Strategies, LLC
Defendant: Senior Health Insurance Company of Pennsylvania, Private Bankers Life Annuity LTC 2, Kevin Cassidy, 40/86 Advisors, Inc., Washington National Insurance Company, BOLN-Agera Corp., Starfish Capital, Inc., John Does 1-100, AGH Parent LLC, Beechwood Re Investment LLC, BBLN-Agera Corp., CNO Financial Group, Inc., Washington National LTC 2, BHLN-Agera Corp., Bankers Conseco Life Insurance Company and Fuzion Analytics, Inc.
Nominal Defendant: Plantinum Management (NY) LLC, Mark Nordlicht, Murray Huberfeld, David Levy and David Bodner
Case Number: 1:2019cv01319
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of April M. Kirby, Esq. re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition, filed by 40/86 Advisors, Inc., Bankers Conseco Life Insurance Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., Washington National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bayliss, A.)
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion For Remand To Delaware Court of Chancery filed by 40/86 Advisors, Inc., Bankers Conseco Life Insurance Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., Washington National Insurance Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/12/2019. (Bayliss, A.)
September 5, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION re #17 Memorandum in Opposition, // Declaration of R. Craig Martin in Support of Senior Health Insurance Company of Pennsylvania and Fuzion Analytics, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Remand Motion by Fuzion Analytics, Inc., Senior Health Insurance Company of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Martin, Robert)
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion For Remand To Delaware Court of Chancery filed by Fuzion Analytics, Inc., Senior Health Insurance Company of Pennsylvania.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/12/2019. (Martin, Robert)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Motion for Remand to September 5, 2019 filed by 40/86 Advisors, Inc., Washington National Insurance Company, Bankers Conseco Life Insurance Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., Set Briefing Schedule: re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion For Remand To Delaware Court of Chancery. (Answering Brief due 9/5/2019., Reply Brief due 9/19/2019.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/29/2019. (nmf)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Motion for Remand to September 5, 2019 - filed by 40/86 Advisors, Inc., Bankers Conseco Life Insurance Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., Washington National Insurance Company. (Kirby, April)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SO ORDERED, re #14 Stipulation filed by Martin Trott & Christopher Smith, Principal Growth Strategies, LLC, Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund L.P. The date by which Beechwood Investments must answer with respect to the Complaint is extended through and including a date twenty-one (21) days following resolution of the Motion to Remand. See Stipulation for further details. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/28/2019. (fms)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Deadline to Answer the Complaint re SO ORDERED,,, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s),, by Martin Trott & Christopher Smith, Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund L.P., Principal Growth Strategies, LLC. (Fallon, Brett)
August 27, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #14 removed and re-docketed to reflect correctly. (lak)
August 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kendal B. Reed for AGH Parent LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Aaron Z. Tobin for AGH Parent LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kendal B. Reed of Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton, PLLC - filed by AGH Parent LLC. (Brown, Paul)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron Z. Tobin of Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton, PLLC - filed by AGH Parent LLC. (Brown, Paul)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron Z. Tobin of Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton, PLLC filed by AGH Parent LLC, #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kendal B. Reed of Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton, PLLC filed by AGH Parent LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/21/2019. (fms)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion For Remand To Delaware Court of Chancery, #10 Opening Brief in Support, //Declaration of Brett D. Fallon in Support of Plaintiff's Motion For Remand To Delaware Court of Chancery by Martin Trott & Christopher Smith, Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund L.P., Principal Growth Strategies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Fallon, Brett)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion For Remand To Delaware Court of Chancery filed by Martin Trott & Christopher Smith, Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund L.P., Principal Growth Strategies, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/29/2019. (Fallon, Brett)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion For Remand To Delaware Court of Chancery - filed by Martin Trott & Christopher Smith, Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund L.P., Principal Growth Strategies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fallon, Brett)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to Until Decision on Motion to Remand - filed by Martin Trott & Christopher Smith, Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund L.P., Principal Growth Strategies, LLC. (Hacker, R.)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to Until Decision on Motion to Remand filed by Martin Trott & Christopher Smith, Principal Growth Strategies, LLC, Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund L.P. Should Plaintiffs elect not to file a Motion to Remand, the date by which the CNO Defendants and the SHIP Defendants must answer or move with respect to the Complaint is extended through and including September 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/14/2019. (fms)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Benedict Cicero on behalf of AGH Parent LLC (Cicero, Joseph)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Damon Brown on behalf of AGH Parent LLC (Brown, Paul)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Joint STATUS REPORT by Martin Trott & Christopher Smith, Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund L.P., Principal Growth Strategies, LLC. (Hacker, R.)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plantinum Management (NY) LLC, Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund L.P., Principal Growth Strategies, LLC. Washington National LTC 2 served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Hacker, R.)
July 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond To The Complaint to August 16, 2019 filed by Martin Trott & Christopher Smith, Principal Growth Strategies, LLC, Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund L.P., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: 40/86 Advisors, Inc. answer due 8/16/2019; Bankers Conseco Life Insurance Company answer due 8/16/2019; CNO Financial Group, Inc. answer due 8/16/2019; Fuzion Analytics, Inc. answer due 8/16/2019; Senior Health Insurance Company of Pennsylvania answer due 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/24/2019. (nmf)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond To The Complaint to August 16, 2019 - filed by Martin Trott & Christopher Smith, Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund L.P., Principal Growth Strategies, LLC. (Fallon, Brett)
July 23, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Starfish Capital, Inc. on 7/23/2019; Washington National LTC 2 on 7/23/2019. (kmd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware, Case Number 2019-0431 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2686944)- filed by Bankers Conseco Life Insurance Company, 40/86 Advisors, Inc., CNO Financial Group, Inc., Washington National Insurance Company.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Principal Growth Strategies, LLC et al v. AGH Parent LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Health Insurance Company of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Robert Craig Martin
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private Bankers Life Annuity LTC 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 40/86 Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: A. Thompson Bayliss
Represented By: April M. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington National Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Thompson Bayliss
Represented By: April M. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOLN-Agera Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starfish Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGH Parent LLC
Represented By: Paul Damon Brown
Represented By: Aaron Z. Tobin
Represented By: Kendal B. Reed
Represented By: Joseph Benedict Cicero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beechwood Re Investment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBLN-Agera Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNO Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: A. Thompson Bayliss
Represented By: April M. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington National LTC 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHLN-Agera Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Conseco Life Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Thompson Bayliss
Represented By: April M. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuzion Analytics, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Craig Martin
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Plantinum Management (NY) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Mark Nordlicht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Murray Huberfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: David Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: David Bodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund L.P.
Represented By: Brett D. Fallon
Represented By: R. Eric Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Trott & Christopher Smith
Represented By: Brett D. Fallon
Represented By: R. Eric Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Growth Strategies, LLC
Represented By: Brett D. Fallon
Represented By: R. Eric Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?