Plumley v. Aerohive Networks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Plumley
Defendant: Clover Merger Sub, Inc., John Gordon Payne, Remo E. Canessa, Ingrid Burton, Aerohive Networks, Inc., Conway Rulon-Miller, Frank J. Marshall, Curtis E. Garner III, Extreme Networks, Inc. and David K. Flynn
Case Number: 1:2019cv01322
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 CASE CLOSED (ntl)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Patrick Plumley (Long, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Plumley: For Frank J. Marshall waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Plumley: For John Gordon Payne waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Plumley: For Conway Rulon-Miller waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Plumley: For David K. Flynn waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Plumley: For Curtis E. Garner III waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Plumley: For Remo E. Canessa waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Plumley: For Ingrid Burton waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Plumley: For Aerohive Networks, Inc. waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Long, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 17, 2019 No Summons Issued. (myr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 filed with Jury Demand against Aerohive Networks, Inc., Ingrid Burton, Remo E. Canessa, Clover Merger Sub, Inc., Extreme Networks, Inc., David K. Flynn, Curtis E. Garner III, Frank J. Marshall, John Gordon Payne, Conway Rulon-Miller - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2687111.) - filed by Patrick Plumley. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plumley v. Aerohive Networks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Plumley
Represented By: Brian D. Long
Represented By: Gina M. Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clover Merger Sub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gordon Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remo E. Canessa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingrid Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerohive Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway Rulon-Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis E. Garner III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extreme Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David K. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?