Midwest Energy Emissions Corp. et al v. Vistra Energy Corp. et al
Plaintiff: MES Inc. and Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.
Defendant: CERT Operations IV LLC, Dynegy Midwest Generation LLC, Illinois Power Resources Generating, LLC, AEP Texas Inc., Belle River Fuels Company, LLC, Talen Energy Holdings, Inc., DTE REF Holdings II LLC, AEP Generation Resources Inc., CERT Coal Holdings LLC, Talen Generation LLC, CERT Operations LLC, Portage Fuels Company, LLC, H. A. Wagner LLC, NRG Energy, Inc., CERT Operations V LLC, Wagner Coaltech LLC, Chem-Mod LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, Midwest Generation EME, LLC, IPH, LLC, Walter Scott Refined Coal LLC, AIG Iowa Refined Coal LLC, CERT Holdings LLC, CERT Operations II LLC, Gallagher Clean Energy, LLC, Louisa Refined Coal, LLC, Thomas Hill Refined Coal LLC, Joppa Refined Coal LLC, Cardinal Operating Company, LLC, John Doe LLCs, CERT Operations RCB LLC, Dynegy Inc., Brandon Shores LLC, AIG Coal, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Talen Energy Corporation, CERT Operations III LLC, Dynegy Miami Fort, LLC, Southwestern Electric Power Co., Vistra Energy Corp., DTE REF Holdings, LLC, Arbor Fuels Company, LLC, CERT Holdings 2018, LLC, AJG Iowa Refined Coal LLC and AJG Coal LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01334
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #38 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 23, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Brandon Shores LLC answer due 9/23/2019; H. A. Wagner LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Talen Energy Corporation answer due 9/23/2019; Talen Generation LLC answer due 9/23/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/6/2019. (nms)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph Evall, Richard W. Mark and Paul J. Kremer, filed by AJG Iowa Refined Coal LLC, Arbor Fuels Company, LLC, DTE REF Holdings, LLC, DTE REF Holdings II LLC, Joppa Refined Coal LLC, Walter Scott Refined Coal LLC, Gallagher Clean Energy, LLC, Louisa Refined Coal, LLC, Portage Fuels Company, LLC, Chem-Mod LLC, Wagner Coaltech LLC, Belle River Fuels Company, LLC, AJG Coal LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Thomas Hill Refined Coal LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2019. (nms)
September 9, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph Evall, Richard W. Mark and Paul J. Kremer - filed by AJG Coal LLC, AJG Iowa Refined Coal LLC, Arbor Fuels Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Belle River Fuels Company, LLC, Chem-Mod LLC, DTE REF Holdings II LLC, DTE REF Holdings, LLC, Gallagher Clean Energy, LLC, Joppa Refined Coal LLC, Louisa Refined Coal, LLC, Portage Fuels Company, LLC, Thomas Hill Refined Coal LLC, Wagner Coaltech LLC, Walter Scott Refined Coal LLC. (Egan, Brian)
September 6, 2019 Filing 38 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Talen Energy Corporation, Brandon Shores LLC, Talen Generation LLC, and H. A. Wagner LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 23, 2019 - filed by MES Inc., Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. (Lennon, James)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer the Complaint to September 23, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Illinois Power Resources Generating, LLC answer due 9/23/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/6/2019. (nms)
September 4, 2019 Filing 37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer the Complaint to September 23, 2019 - filed by Illinois Power Resources Generating, LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 4, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Illinois Power Resources Generating, LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Frederick L. Cottrell, III. Attorney Nitika Gupta Fiorella and the law firm of Fish & Richardson P.C. terminated. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 23, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: CERT Coal Holdings LLC answer due 9/23/2019; CERT Holdings 2018, LLC answer due 9/23/2019; CERT Holdings LLC answer due 9/23/2019; CERT Operations II LLC answer due 9/23/2019; CERT Operations III LLC answer due 9/23/2019; CERT Operations IV LLC answer due 9/23/2019; CERT Operations LLC answer due 9/23/2019; CERT Operations RCB LLC answer due 9/23/2019; CERT Operations V LLC answer due 9/23/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/3/2019. (nms)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #33 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to September 23, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Midwest Generation EME, LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Midwest Generation, LLC answer due 9/23/2019; NRG Energy, Inc. answer due 9/23/2019; NRG Texas Power LLC answer due 9/23/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/30/2019. (nms)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #32 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to September 23, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Dynegy Inc. answer due 9/23/2019; Dynegy Miami Fort, LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Dynegy Midwest Generation LLC answer due 9/23/2019; IPH, LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Vistra Energy Corp. answer due 9/23/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/30/2019. (nms)
August 30, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 23, 2019 - filed by CERT Coal Holdings LLC, CERT Holdings 2018, LLC, CERT Holdings LLC, CERT Operations II LLC, CERT Operations III LLC, CERT Operations IV LLC, CERT Operations LLC, CERT Operations RCB LLC, CERT Operations V LLC. (Saunders, Robert)
August 30, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scott Saunders on behalf of CERT Coal Holdings LLC, CERT Holdings 2018, LLC, CERT Holdings LLC, CERT Operations II LLC, CERT Operations III LLC, CERT Operations IV LLC, CERT Operations LLC, CERT Operations RCB LLC, CERT Operations V LLC (Saunders, Robert)
August 30, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to September 23, 2019 - filed by Midwest Generation EME, LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Energy, Inc., NRG Texas Power LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick)
August 30, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to September 23, 2019 - filed by Dynegy Inc., Dynegy Miami Fort, LLC, Dynegy Midwest Generation LLC, IPH, LLC, Vistra Energy Corp.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
August 30, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The notice filed at D.I. 30 has been removed from the docket per counsel's request as it contained errors. (nms)
August 29, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Dynegy Inc., Dynegy Miami Fort, LLC, Dynegy Midwest Generation LLC, IPH, LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Frederick L. Cottrell, III. Attorney Nitika Gupta Fiorella terminated. (Cottrell, Frederick)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 9, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: AEP Generation Resources Inc. answer due 10/9/2019; AEP Texas Inc. answer due 10/9/2019; Cardinal Operating Company, LLC answer due 10/9/2019; Southwestern Electric Power Co. answer due 10/9/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/29/2019. (nms)
August 29, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 9, 2019, filed by AEP Generation Resources Inc., AEP Texas Inc., Cardinal Operating Company, LLC, Southwestern Electric Power Co.. (Smith, Rodger) Modified on 8/29/2019 (nms).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND to respond to the Complaint to September 23, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: AJG Coal LLC answer due 9/23/2019; AJG Iowa Refined Coal LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Arbor Fuels Company, LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. answer due 9/23/2019; Belle River Fuels Company, LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Chem-Mod LLC answer due 9/23/2019; DTE REF Holdings II LLC answer due 9/23/2019; DTE REF Holdings, LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Gallagher Clean Energy, LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Joppa Refined Coal LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Louisa Refined Coal, LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Portage Fuels Company, LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Thomas Hill Refined Coal LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Wagner Coaltech LLC answer due 9/23/2019; Walter Scott Refined Coal LLC answer due 9/23/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/29/2019. (nms)
August 29, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to respond to the Complaint to September 23, 2019 - filed by AJG Coal LLC, AJG Iowa Refined Coal LLC, Arbor Fuels Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Belle River Fuels Company, LLC, Chem-Mod LLC, DTE REF Holdings II LLC, DTE REF Holdings, LLC, Gallagher Clean Energy, LLC, Joppa Refined Coal LLC, Louisa Refined Coal, LLC, Portage Fuels Company, LLC, Thomas Hill Refined Coal LLC, Wagner Coaltech LLC, Walter Scott Refined Coal LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 23, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of requesting clerk to remove Nitika Gupta Fiorell and the law firm of Fish & Richardson P.C. for Defendant Vistra Energy Corp. Please take notice that Frederick L. Cottrell, III, Tyler E. Cragg and the law firm of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. hereby enter their appearance on behalf of Defendant Vistra Energy Corp. by Vistra Energy Corp. (Cottrell, Frederick)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul R. Morico, Elizabeth Durham Flannery, Ali Dhanani, and Thomas B. Carter, Jr., filed by NRG Energy, Inc., Midwest Generation EME, LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/14/2019. (nms)
August 13, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul R. Morico, Elizabeth Durham Flannery, Ali Dhanani, and Thomas B. Carter, Jr. - filed by Midwest Generation EME, LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Energy, Inc., NRG Texas Power LLC. (Cragg, Tyler)
August 8, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler E. Cragg on behalf of Midwest Generation EME, LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Energy, Inc., NRG Texas Power LLC (Cragg, Tyler)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 9, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: AEP Generation Resources Inc. answer due 9/9/2019; AEP Texas Inc. answer due 9/9/2019; Cardinal Operating Company, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Southwestern Electric Power Co. answer due 9/9/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/8/2019. (nms)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to September 9, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: AIG Coal, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; AIG Iowa Refined Coal LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Arbor Fuels Company, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. answer due 9/9/2019; Belle River Fuels Company, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Chem-Mod LLC answer due 9/9/2019; DTE REF Holdings II LLC answer due 9/9/2019; DTE REF Holdings, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Gallagher Clean Energy, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Joppa Refined Coal LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Louisa Refined Coal, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Portage Fuels Company, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Thomas Hill Refined Coal LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Wagner Coaltech LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Walter Scott Refined Coal LLC answer due 9/9/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/8/2019. (nms)
August 7, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to September 9, 2019 - filed by AIG Coal, LLC, AIG Iowa Refined Coal LLC, Arbor Fuels Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Belle River Fuels Company, LLC, Chem-Mod LLC, DTE REF Holdings II LLC, DTE REF Holdings, LLC, Gallagher Clean Energy, LLC, Joppa Refined Coal LLC, Louisa Refined Coal, LLC, Portage Fuels Company, LLC, Thomas Hill Refined Coal LLC, Wagner Coaltech LLC, Walter Scott Refined Coal LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 8/8/2019 (nms).
August 7, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants AEP Generation Resources Inc., Southwestern Electric Power Co., Cardinal Operating Company, LLC and AEP Texas Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to September 9, 2019 - filed by AEP Generation Resources Inc., AEP Texas Inc., Cardinal Operating Company, LLC, Southwestern Electric Power Co.. (Smith, Rodger)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or otherwise Respond to the Complaint to September 9, (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Midwest Generation EME, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Midwest Generation, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; NRG Energy, Inc. answer due 9/9/2019; NRG Texas Power LLC answer due 9/9/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/6/2019. (nms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or otherwise Respond to the Complaint to September 9, 2019 - filed by Midwest Generation EME, LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Energy, Inc., NRG Texas Power LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 9, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: CERT Coal Holdings LLC answer due 9/9/2019; CERT Holdings 2018, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; CERT Holdings LLC answer due 9/9/2019; CERT Operations II LLC answer due 9/9/2019; CERT Operations III LLC answer due 9/9/2019; CERT Operations IV LLC answer due 9/9/2019; CERT Operations LLC answer due 9/9/2019; CERT Operations RCB LLC answer due 9/9/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2019. (nms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 9, 2019 - filed by MES Inc., Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. (Lennon, James) Modified on 8/5/2019 (nms).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Brandon Shores LLC answer due 9/9/2019; H. A. Wagner LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Talen Energy Corporation answer due 9/9/2019; Talen Energy Holdings, Inc. answer due 9/9/2019; Talen Generation LLC answer due 9/9/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/2/2019. (nms)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by MES Inc., Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. (Lennon, James) Modified on 8/2/2019 (nms).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to September 9, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Dynegy Inc. answer due 9/9/2019; Dynegy Miami Fort, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Dynegy Midwest Generation LLC answer due 9/9/2019; IPH, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Illinois Power Resources Generating, LLC answer due 9/9/2019; Vistra Energy Corp. answer due 9/9/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/25/2019. (nms)
July 25, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to September 9, 2019 - filed by Dynegy Inc., Dynegy Miami Fort, LLC, Dynegy Midwest Generation LLC, Vistra Energy Corp.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bradley W. Caldwell, filed by MES Inc., Midwest Energy Emissions Corp., and #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Justin T. Nemunaitis, filed by MES Inc., Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/25/2019. (nms)
July 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp., MES Inc.. AEP Generation Resources Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; AEP Texas Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Arbor Fuels Company, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Belle River Fuels Company, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Cardinal Operating Company, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; DTE REF Holdings II LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; DTE REF Holdings, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Midwest Generation EME, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Midwest Generation, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; NRG Energy, Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; NRG Texas Power LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Portage Fuels Company, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Southwestern Electric Power Co. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Lennon, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp., MES Inc.. Brandon Shores LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; CERT Coal Holdings LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; CERT Holdings 2018, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; CERT Holdings LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; CERT Operations II LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; CERT Operations III LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; CERT Operations IV LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; CERT Operations LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; CERT Operations RCB LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; CERT Operations V LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Chem-Mod LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Gallagher Clean Energy, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; H. A. Wagner LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Joppa Refined Coal LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Louisa Refined Coal, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Talen Energy Corporation served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Talen Energy Holdings, Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Talen Generation LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Thomas Hill Refined Coal LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Wagner Coaltech LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Walter Scott Refined Coal LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Lennon, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp., MES Inc.. Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Lennon, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp., MES Inc.. AIG Coal, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Lennon, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp., MES Inc.. Vistra Energy Corp. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Lennon, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp., MES Inc.. IPH, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Lennon, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp., MES Inc.. Illinois Power Resources Generating, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Lennon, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp., MES Inc.. Dynegy Midwest Generation LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Lennon, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp., MES Inc.. Dynegy Miami Fort, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Lennon, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp., MES Inc.. Dynegy Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Lennon, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp., MES Inc.. AIG Iowa Refined Coal LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Lennon, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Midwest Energy Emissions Corp. for MES Inc. filed by MES Inc.. (Lennon, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. (Lennon, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bradley W. Caldwell - filed by MES Inc., Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. (Lennon, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Justin T. Nemunaitis - filed by MES Inc., Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.. (Lennon, James)
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to AEP Generation Resources Inc. on 7/17/2019; AEP Texas Inc. on 7/17/2019; AIG Coal, LLC on 7/17/2019; AIG Iowa Refined Coal LLC on 7/17/2019; Arbor Fuels Company, LLC on 7/17/2019; Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. on 7/17/2019; Belle River Fuels Company, LLC on 7/17/2019; Brandon Shores LLC on 7/17/2019; CERT Coal Holdings LLC on 7/17/2019; CERT Holdings 2018, LLC on 7/17/2019; CERT Holdings LLC on 7/17/2019; CERT Operations II LLC on 7/17/2019; CERT Operations III LLC on 7/17/2019; CERT Operations IV LLC on 7/17/2019; CERT Operations LLC on 7/17/2019; CERT Operations RCB LLC on 7/17/2019; CERT Operations V LLC on 7/17/2019; Cardinal Operating Company, LLC on 7/17/2019; Chem-Mod LLC on 7/17/2019; DTE REF Holdings II LLC on 7/17/2019; DTE REF Holdings, LLC on 7/17/2019; Dynegy Inc. on 7/17/2019; Dynegy Miami Fort, LLC on 7/17/2019; Dynegy Midwest Generation LLC on 7/17/2019; Gallagher Clean Energy, LLC on 7/17/2019; H. A. Wagner LLC on 7/17/2019; IPH, LLC on 7/17/2019; Illinois Power Resources Generating, LLC on 7/17/2019; Joppa Refined Coal LLC on 7/17/2019; Louisa Refined Coal, LLC on 7/17/2019; Midwest Generation EME, LLC on 7/17/2019; Midwest Generation, LLC on 7/17/2019; NRG Energy, Inc. on 7/17/2019; NRG Texas Power LLC on 7/17/2019; Portage Fuels Company, LLC on 7/17/2019; Southwestern Electric Power Co. on 7/17/2019; Talen Energy Corporation on 7/17/2019; Talen Energy Holdings, Inc. on 7/17/2019; Talen Generation LLC on 7/17/2019; Thomas Hill Refined Coal LLC on 7/17/2019; Vistra Energy Corp. on 7/17/2019; Wagner Coaltech LLC on 7/17/2019; Walter Scott Refined Coal LLC on 7/17/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 10,343,114 B2; US 8,168,147 B2. (nmg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against AEP Generation Resources Inc., AEP Texas Inc., AJG Coal, LLC, AJG Iowa Refined Coal LLC, Arbor Fuels Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Belle River Fuels Company, LLC, Brandon Shores LLC, CERT Coal Holdings LLC, CERT Holdings 2018, LLC, CERT Holdings LLC, CERT Operations II LLC, CERT Operations III LLC, CERT Operations IV LLC, CERT Operations LLC, CERT Operations RCB LLC, CERT Operations V LLC, Cardinal Operating Company, LLC, Chem-Mod LLC, DTE REF Holdings II LLC, DTE REF Holdings, LLC, Dynegy Inc., Dynegy Miami Fort, LLC, Dynegy Midwest Generation LLC, Gallagher Clean Energy, LLC, H. A. Wagner LLC, IPH, LLC, Illinois Power Resources Generating, LLC, John Doe LLCs, Joppa Refined Coal LLC, Louisa Refined Coal, LLC, Midwest Generation EME, LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Energy, Inc., NRG Texas Power LLC, Portage Fuels Company, LLC, Southwestern Electric Power Co., Talen Energy Corporation, Talen Energy Holdings, Inc., Talen Generation LLC, Thomas Hill Refined Coal LLC, Vistra Energy Corp., Wagner Coaltech LLC, Walter Scott Refined Coal LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2687794.) - filed by Midwest Energy Emissions Corp., MES Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) Modified on 8/8/2019 (nms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Energy Emissions Corp. et al v. Vistra Energy Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERT Operations IV LLC
Represented By: Jessica R. Kunz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy Midwest Generation LLC
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Nitika Gupta Fiorella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Power Resources Generating, LLC
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEP Texas Inc.
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belle River Fuels Company, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talen Energy Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTE REF Holdings II LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEP Generation Resources Inc.
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERT Coal Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jessica R. Kunz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talen Generation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERT Operations LLC
Represented By: Jessica R. Kunz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portage Fuels Company, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. A. Wagner LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRG Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERT Operations V LLC
Represented By: Jessica R. Kunz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagner Coaltech LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chem-Mod LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRG Texas Power LLC
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Generation, LLC
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Generation EME, LLC
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPH, LLC
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Scott Refined Coal LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Iowa Refined Coal LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERT Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jessica R. Kunz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERT Operations II LLC
Represented By: Jessica R. Kunz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Clean Energy, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisa Refined Coal, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hill Refined Coal LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joppa Refined Coal LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe LLCs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERT Operations RCB LLC
Represented By: Jessica R. Kunz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy Inc.
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Nitika Gupta Fiorella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Shores LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Coal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talen Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERT Operations III LLC
Represented By: Jessica R. Kunz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy Miami Fort, LLC
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Nitika Gupta Fiorella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Electric Power Co.
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vistra Energy Corp.
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Nitika Gupta Fiorella
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTE REF Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbor Fuels Company, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERT Holdings 2018, LLC
Represented By: Jessica R. Kunz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJG Iowa Refined Coal LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJG Coal LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MES Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Lennon
Represented By: James M Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Energy Emissions Corp.
Represented By: James Michael Lennon
Represented By: James M Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?