Cynthia Hoynoski v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hoynoski
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01335
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summonses served on U.S. Attorney General, Commissioner of Social Security, on July 26, 2019, filed by Cynthia Hoynoski. (Linarducci, Gary)
August 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Karl E. Osterhout for Cynthia Hoynoski added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Social Security Administration (Benderson, Heather)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karl E. Osterhout filed by Cynthia Hoynoski. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/29/19. (ntl)
July 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 18, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to plaintiff's counsel per request. (amf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karl E. Osterhout - filed by Cynthia Hoynoski. (Linarducci, Gary)
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General on 07/17/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew M. Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2687976.) - filed by Cynthia Hoynoski.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cynthia Hoynoski v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hoynoski
Represented By: Gary C. Linarducci
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?