FinancialApps, LLC v. Envestnet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: FinancialApps, LLC
Defendant: Envestnet, Inc. and Yodlee, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01337
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery filed by FinancialApps, LLC. (Kraman, Pilar)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery filed by Envestnet, Inc., Yodlee, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Word Count Certification, #2 Exhibits A-C, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Henry)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery - filed by FinancialApps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Word Count Certification, #2 Certification Pursuant to D.Del. LR 7.1.1, #3 Exhibit A - C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraman, Pilar)
August 7, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Gary M. Elden, Gary M. Miller, and Benjamin E. Sedrish for Envestnet, Inc. and Yodlee, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary M. Miller, Gary M. Elden and Benjamin E. Sedrish filed by Envestnet, Inc., Yodlee, Inc., #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc E. Kasowitz, Matthew A. Kraus, A. MacDonald Caputo, Jr. and Joshua E. Hollander filed by FinancialApps, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/6/2019. (fms)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc E. Kasowitz, Matthew A. Kraus, A. MacDonald Caputo, Jr. and Joshua E. Hollander - filed by FinancialApps, LLC. (Kraman, Pilar)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary M. Miller, Gary M. Elden and Benjamin E. Sedrish - filed by Envestnet, Inc., Yodlee, Inc.. (Gallagher, Henry)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Envestnet, Inc. for Yodlee, Inc. filed by Envestnet, Inc., Yodlee, Inc.. (Gallagher, Henry)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry E. Gallagher, Jr on behalf of Envestnet, Inc., Yodlee, Inc. (Gallagher, Henry)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, by FinancialApps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 6)(Kraman, Pilar)
July 24, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The last two pages of the exhibits to the sealed complaint D.I. #2 have been placed in proper order per request of filer. (nmf)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, [Unopposed] filed by FinancialApps, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Envestnet, Inc. answer due 9/17/2019; Yodlee, Inc. answer due 9/17/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/24/2019. (nmf)
July 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, [Unopposed] - filed by FinancialApps, LLC. (Kraman, Pilar)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - D.I. #1 Motion For Leave to File Complaint Under Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/17/2019. (amf)
July 17, 2019 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge (MN). (amf)
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Envestnet, Inc. and Yodlee, Inc. on 7/17/2019. (amf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Freedomquest, LLC for FinancialApps, LLC filed by FinancialApps, LLC. (amf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Envestnet, Inc. and Yodlee, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX032093) - filed by FinancialApps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/24/2019) (nmf, ).
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL - filed by FinancialApps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FinancialApps, LLC v. Envestnet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envestnet, Inc.
Represented By: Henry E. Gallagher, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Newell
Represented By: Gary M. Elden
Represented By: Gary M. Miller
Represented By: Lauren Patrice DeLuca
Represented By: Benjamin E. Sedrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yodlee, Inc.
Represented By: Henry E. Gallagher, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Newell
Represented By: Gary M. Elden
Represented By: Gary M. Miller
Represented By: Lauren Patrice DeLuca
Represented By: Benjamin E. Sedrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FinancialApps, LLC
Represented By: Comrie Barr Flinn
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Represented By: Emily V. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?