Kelly v. Marketplace/Blue Cross Highmark - Delaware
Plaintiff: Alexandra B. Kelly
Defendant: Marketplace/Blue Cross Highmark - Delaware
Case Number: 1:2019cv01357
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Highmark BCVSD Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or for More Definitive Statement by Marketplace/Blue Cross Highmark - Delaware re #14 Reply to Response to Motion (Grivner, Geoffrey)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or for More Definitive Statement filed by Marketplace/Blue Cross Highmark - Delaware. (Grivner, Geoffrey)
September 4, 2019 Set Reply Brief Deadline - re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or for More Definitive Statement - Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/10/2019. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 9/4/2019*** (dlw)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 Letter to the Court regarding upcoming back surgery - filed by Alexandra Kelly. (amf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re D.I. #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or for More Definitive Statement - filed by Alexandra B. Kelly. (amf)
August 28, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or for More Definitive Statement - Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/11/2019. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 8/28/2019*** (dlw)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or for More Definitive Statement - filed by Marketplace/Blue Cross Highmark - Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Compliance)(Grivner, Geoffrey) Modified on 8/28/2019 (dlw).
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Alexandra B. Kelly. (kmd)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Alexandra B. Kelly. (kmd)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Alexandra B. Kelly. Marketplace/Blue Cross Highmark - Delaware served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (kmd)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Important Evidence to the Lawsuit by Alexandra B. Kelly (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(kmd)
August 7, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Marketplace/Blue Cross Highmark - Delaware. (myr)
August 7, 2019 Remark: Clerk's office issued second copy of FRCP rule 4 to Pro se PLAINTIFF. (sam)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of F.R.Civ.P. 4 - filed by Alexandra B. Kelly. (amf)
July 31, 2019 Remark: Rule 4 mailed to pro se Plaintiff for signature. (amf)
July 31, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
July 30, 2019 Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number DEX032130. (amf)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, denying request to proceed informa pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30-days or the case shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/25/2019. (nmg)
July 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 [SEALED] EXHIBIT 1 re: D.I. #2 Complaint (Pro Se) by Alexandra B. Kelly.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7)(mal)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT-filed Pro Se against Marketplace/Blue Cross Highmark - Delaware - filed by Alexandra B. Kelly.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Alexandra B. Kelly. (mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Marketplace/Blue Cross Highmark - Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra B. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marketplace/Blue Cross Highmark - Delaware
Represented By: Geoffrey Graham Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?