Mitchell v. Saul
Plaintiff: Michelle Mitchell
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01383
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (D.I. #1 ) is GRANTED. Within ninety (90) days from filing the entry of appearance, the Acting Commissioner of Social Security shall serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and shall also file the transcript of Social Security proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/6/2019. (kmd) Modified on 8/7/2019 (nms).
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Benderson, Heather)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/31/2019. (myr) Modified on 8/1/2019 (nms).
July 31, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew M. Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Michelle Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Michelle Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 IFP Long Form)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Mitchell
Represented By: John S. Whitelaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?