Mikkilineni v. PayPal, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maheswar Mikkilineni
Defendant: Shijil TS/Sparksupport Infotech Pvt Ltd., GoDaddy.com, LLC, Director/Chandra X-Ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA) and PayPal, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01391
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 24 SECOND Letter to Honorable Judge Colm F. Connolly from Maheswar Mikkilineni, dated 9/16/2019 regarding D.I. #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (myr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 23 Letter to Honorable Judge Colm F. Connolly, dated 9/11/2019 from Maheswar Mikkilineni regarding D.I. #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (myr)
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Director/Chandra X-Ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA). (Dailey, Derick)
September 5, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen S. Swift on behalf of PayPal, Inc. (Swift, Kristen)
August 29, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The response to the Motion to Remand was deleted per request of counsel as it was filed prematurely. (nmf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by Maheswar Mikkilineni. (lak)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 SUR-REPLY BRIEF to D. I. #3 MOTION to Substitute Party: United States of America to replace Director/Chandra X-ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA) (CXC) and D.I. #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona filed by Maheswar Mikkilineni. (mal)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's REPLY to D.I. #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and Reply to Response to Motion re D.I. #5 filed by Maheswar Mikkilineni. (nmg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona , with Certificate of Service filed by GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Compliance with Word Count and Typeface Requirements)(Fischer, Gregory)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Substitute Party: United States of America to replace Director/Chandra X-ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA) (CXC), MOTION for Discovery filed by Director/Chandra X-Ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA). (Dailey, Derick)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona, MOTION to Remand filed by Director/Chandra X-Ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA). (Dailey, Derick)
August 8, 2019 MOTION to Remand (SEE D.I. #14 ) - filed by Maheswar Mikkilineni. (sam)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re D.I. #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona - filed by Maheswar Mikkilineni.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2019. (sam)
August 8, 2019 MOTION for Discovery (SEE D.I. #13 ) - filed by Maheswar Mikkilineni. (sam)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re D.I. #3 MOTION to Substitute Party: United States of America to replace Director/Chandra X-ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA) (CXC), and in opposition to re D.I. #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Maheswar Mikkilineni. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2019. (sam)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for a short-Discovery before a Hearing on the Notice filed by Director/Chandra X-Ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dailey, Derick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's Amended Complaint - filed by Director/Chandra X-Ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dailey, Derick)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Derick D. Dailey on behalf of Director/Chandra X-Ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA) (Dailey, Derick)
August 2, 2019 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Other Affiliate Kolhlberg Kravis Roberts & Co., L.P. for GoDaddy.com, LLC. (fms)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona with Certificate of Service filed by GoDaddy.com, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Fischer, Gregory)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona - filed by GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fischer, Gregory)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent GoDaddy Operating Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Desert Newco, LLC for GoDaddy.com, LLC filed by GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Fischer, Gregory)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory F. Fischer on behalf of GoDaddy.com, LLC (Fischer, Gregory)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to (D.I. #1 ) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and MOTION for a short-Discovery before a Hearing on the Notice - filed by Maheswar Mikkilineni. (mal)
August 1, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I. #4 has been replaced with a corrected version (to insert a date into the blank in the motion) per request of counsel. (nmf)
July 31, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Director/Chandra X-Ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Delcaration of Roger Brissenden, #2 Exhibit B - Delcaration of Judith Leonard, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hatcher, Laura) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/1/2019) (nmf, ).
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Party: United States of America to replace Director/Chandra X-ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA) (CXC) - filed by Director/Chandra X-Ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Certification, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hatcher, Laura)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N19C-05-123 PRW (fee waived) - filed by Director/Chandra X-Ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mikkilineni v. PayPal, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shijil TS/Sparksupport Infotech Pvt Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com, LLC
Represented By: Gregory F. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director/Chandra X-Ray Center (CXC) for Astrophysics/Harvard & Smithsonian (CFA)
Represented By: Laura D. Hatcher
Represented By: Derick D. Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen S. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maheswar Mikkilineni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?