Incyte Corporation et al v. Incysus Therapeutics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Incyte Holdings Corporation and Incyte Corporation
Defendant: Incysus Therapeutics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01451
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Incyte Corporation, Incyte Holdings Corporation: For Incysus Therapeutics, Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Francella, Thomas)
August 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Kevin M. Gibbs, J. Trevor Cloak, Camille M. Miller, Melanie A. Miller for Incyte Corporation and Incyte Holdings Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Camille M. Miller filed by Incyte Holdings Corporation, Incyte Corporation, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melanie A. Miller filed by Incyte Holdings Corporation, Incyte Corporation, #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin M. Gibbs filed by Incyte Holdings Corporation, Incyte Corporation, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Trevor Cloak filed by Incyte Holdings Corporation, Incyte Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/19/2019. (fms)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Trevor Cloak - filed by Incyte Corporation, Incyte Holdings Corporation. (Francella, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Camille M. Miller - filed by Incyte Corporation, Incyte Holdings Corporation. (Francella, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melanie A. Miller - filed by Incyte Corporation, Incyte Holdings Corporation. (Francella, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin M. Gibbs - filed by Incyte Corporation, Incyte Holdings Corporation. (Francella, Thomas)
August 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
August 2, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Incysus Therapeutics, Inc. on 8/2/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,104,367; 3,044,806; 4,052,607; 87/960,227. (kmd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Incysus Therapeutics, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2699764.) - filed by Incyte Corporation, Incyte Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Incyte Corporation et al v. Incysus Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Incysus Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Incyte Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin M. Gibbs
Represented By: J. Trevor Cloak
Represented By: Camille M. Miller
Represented By: Melanie A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Incyte Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin M. Gibbs
Represented By: J. Trevor Cloak
Represented By: Camille M. Miller
Represented By: Melanie A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?