In re: J & M Sales Inc., et al.
Appellee: Pegasus Trucking, LLC
Appellant: Swipe Payment Solutions and Priority Payment Systems
Debtor: J & M Sales Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01453
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Mediation Conference is set for 11/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/23/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01452-LPS, 1:19-cv-01453-LPS(dlb)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Mediation Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 9/16/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01452-LPS, 1:19-cv-01453-LPS(dlb)
September 3, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Judge Christopher J. Burke - Bankruptcy Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01452-LPS, 1:19-cv-01453-LPS(cak)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alan G. Tippie, Esq. filed by Pegasus Trucking, LLC, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Asa S. Hami, Esq. filed by Pegasus Trucking, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/23/19. (ntl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Asa S. Hami, Esq. - filed by Pegasus Trucking, LLC. (Stulman, Aaron)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alan G. Tippie, Esq. - filed by Pegasus Trucking, LLC. (Stulman, Aaron)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alan M. Feld filed by Priority Payment Systems, Swipe Payment Solutions, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Theodore A. Cohen filed by Priority Payment Systems, Swipe Payment Solutions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/13/19. (ntl)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Theodore A. Cohen - filed by Priority Payment Systems, Swipe Payment Solutions. (Songonuga, Natasha)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alan M. Feld - filed by Priority Payment Systems, Swipe Payment Solutions. (Songonuga, Natasha)
August 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Monday, August 19, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01452-UNA, 1:19-cv-01453-UNA(cak)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (amf)
August 2, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (amf)
August 2, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (amf)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 7/23/2019 by Judge John T. Dorsey in Bankruptcy case number 18-11801 JTD. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Swipe Payment Solutions, Priority Payment Systems. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: J & M Sales Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Pegasus Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Samis
Represented By: Aaron Hollis Stulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Swipe Payment Solutions
Represented By: Natasha M. Songonuga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Priority Payment Systems
Represented By: Natasha M. Songonuga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: J & M Sales Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?