KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. v. AMGEN, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. and KINNEY DRUGS
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Amgen Inc., Actavis plc and Watson Laboratories Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01460
Filed: August 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Case was accidentally opened as 19md1460. Case is now 19cv1460. 19md1460 no longer exists. (rwc)
August 5, 2019 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (sam)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:19-md-2895 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (sam)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Record of case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:19-cv-01510. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Transfer Order from U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Re: Order that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Delaware are transferred to the District of Delaware, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Hon. Leonard P. Stark for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/5/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMGEN'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS ADJOURNED SINE DIE, SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPHS 4-6 BELOW. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/19/19. 6/20/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED. COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/5/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas J. Crean, Jr. re: served Summons and Complaint upon Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Personal Service on 5/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAST, DIANNE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/5/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. AMGEN, INC. waiver sent on 5/15/2019 WITH STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAST, DIANNE) Modified on 5/28/2019 (lvj, ). (STIPULATION FILED IN ERROR; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/5/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. waiver sent on 5/7/2019; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 5/7/2019; WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. waiver sent on 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAST, DIANNE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/5/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Copy Re: Documents (Motion of Plaintiff UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund for Transfer to and Consolidation or Coordination of Related Antitrust Actions in the District of Delaware for Pretrial Proceedings) Filed Before the JPML regarding In Re: Sensipar (Cinacalcet Hydrochloride Tablets Antitrust Litigation). (ems) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/5/2019.]
April 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/5/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS PLC, AMGEN, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. 6 Forwarded To: Counsel on 4/10/2019 (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/5/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS PLC, AMGEN, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 195498.), filed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC..(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. v. AMGEN, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KINNEY DRUGS
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amgen Inc.
Represented By: MELANIE L. KATSUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?