TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND et al v. AMGEN INC. et al
Plaintiff: TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND and TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Amgen Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis plc and Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01461
Filed: August 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (sam)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:19-md-2895 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (sam)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 Record of case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number in Other District: 2:19-cv-08561. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Delaware. (MDL 2895 - Judge Leonard P. Stark) (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND (lag, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by LIZA M. WALSH (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Copy of a Notice of Withdrawal filed by Joseph J. DePalma, Esq., at the JMPL for MDL 2895 Sensipar Antitrust Litigation. (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Copy of a Notice of Appearance of Henninger Bullock on behalf of Defendants, Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., and Actavis Pharma, Inc., filed in the JMPL under MDL 2895 Sensipar Antitrust Litigation, with Proof of Service.= and a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Motion of Plaintiff KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., for transfer of related actions to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania in IN RE: SENSIPAR ANTITRUST LITIGATION MDL 2895. (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Motion of Plaintiff, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund for transfer to and consolidation or coordination of related antitrust actions in the District of Delaware for pretrial proceedings in IN RE SENSIPAR (CINACALCET HYDROCHLORIDE TABLETS) ANTITRUST LITIGATION MDL 2895 (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER that parties will meet and confer to discuss scheduling issues; In absence of an agreement, Parties reserve the right to seek relief from the Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/16/2019. (byl) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy Waldor enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS PLC, AMGEN INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LEE ALBERT on behalf of TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND (ALBERT, LEE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS PLC, AMGEN INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9500802) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Non-Arbitrability, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DEPALMA, JOSEPH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND et al v. AMGEN INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amgen Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND
Represented By: Lee Albert
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND
Represented By: Lee Albert
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?