In Re Camping World Holdings, Inc. Stockholder Derivative Litigation
Plaintiff: David Janssen and Judith Sandler
Defendant: Crestview Partners II GP, L.P., Crestview Advisors, L.L.C., Brent Moody, Marcus Lemonis, Stephen Adams, K. Dillon Schickli, Camping World, Mary George, Michael Malone, Andris Baltins, Thomas Wolfe, Jeffrey Marcus, Brian Cassidy and Howard Kosick
Nominal Defendant: Camping World Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01467
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 CASE STAYED. (dlw)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SO ORDERED re (5 in 1:19-cv-01467-MN, 5 in 1:19-cv-01468-MN) Stipulation and Order Staying the Action Pending Resolution in the Related Securities Class Action. These actions are CONSOLIDATED and STAYED. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER AND COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/25/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01467-MN, 1:19-cv-01468-MN(dlw)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Staying the Action Pending Resolution in the Related Securities Class Action by Stephen Adams, Andris Baltins, Camping World Holdings, Inc., Brian Cassidy, Crestview Advisors, L.L.C., Crestview Partners II GP, L.P., Mary George, Howard Kosick, Marcus Lemonis, Michael Malone, Jeffrey Marcus, Brent Moody, K. Dillon Schickli, Thomas Wolfe. (Williams, Gregory)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P. Williams on behalf of Stephen Adams, Andris Baltins, Camping World Holdings, Inc., Brian Cassidy, Crestview Advisors, L.L.C., Crestview Partners II GP, L.P., Mary George, Howard Kosick, Marcus Lemonis, Michael Malone, Jeffrey Marcus, Brent Moody, K. Dillon Schickli, Thomas Wolfe (Williams, Gregory)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by David Janssen: For Stephen Adams waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Andris Baltins waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Camping World Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Brian Cassidy waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Crestview Advisors, L.L.C. waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Crestview Partners II GP, L.P. waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Mary George waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Howard Kosick waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Marcus Lemonis waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Michael Malone waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Jeffrey Marcus waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Brent Moody waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; K. Dillon Schickli waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Thomas Wolfe waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Ernst, Ryan)
August 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01467-MN, 1:19-cv-01468-MN(nmg)
August 6, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Shareholder Derivative COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Stephen Adams, Andris Baltins, Camping World, Camping World Holdings, Inc., Brian Cassidy, Crestview Advisors, L.L.C., Crestview Partners II GP, L.P., Mary George, Howard Kosick, Marcus Lemonis, Michael Malone, Jeffrey Marcus, Brent Moody, K. Dillon Schickli, Thomas Wolfe - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2702531.) - filed by David Janssen. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Plaintiff David Janssen, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Camping World Holdings, Inc. Stockholder Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crestview Partners II GP, L.P.
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crestview Advisors, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Moody
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Lemonis
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Dillon Schickli
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camping World
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary George
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Malone
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andris Baltins
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Wolfe
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Marcus
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Cassidy
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Kosick
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Camping World Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Regan
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Janssen
Represented By: Ryan M. Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Sandler
Represented By: Ryan M. Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?