Hernandez v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Rachel Hernandez
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01487
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, by Rachel Hernandez (Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 9/27/2019 (nms).
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to October 4, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 10/4/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/6/2019. (nms)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to October 4, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rachel Hernandez. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
August 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
August 9, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 8/9/2019. (Mailed to Philadelphia office per attorney request) (sam)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2705227.) - filed by Rachel Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Hernandez
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?