PT Network, LLC v. Rosanna Badillo-Sanchez et al
Plaintiff: PT Network, LLC
Defendant: Rosanna Badillo-Sanchez, Rosanna Sanchez, Cleaning Services of Delaware, LLC, Rosanna Badillo and Michael Sanchez
Case Number: 1:2019cv01514
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 The 9/30/2019 Oral Argument is cancelled per D.I. #15 . (nmf)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 Letter to the Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Michele Allen. (Allen, Michele)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SO ORDERED, re #13 Stipulation and Scheduling Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Set Briefing Schedule: re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Answering Brief due 9/16/2019., Reply Brief due 9/19/2019.), ORDER, Setting Hearings( An Oral Argument is set for 9/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/10/2019. (nmf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Scheduling Order re: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PT Network, LLC. (Czerwonka, Scott)
September 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William Scales for PT Network, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William Scales filed by PT Network, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/6/2019. (fms)
September 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher W. Cardwell for PT Network, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele D. Allen on behalf of Rosanna Badillo-Sanchez, Cleaning Services of Delaware, LLC, Michael Sanchez (Allen, Michele)
September 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Telephone Conference held on 9/5/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Counsel to submit a proposed order to the Court containing the briefing schedule and the oral argument date. (nmf)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William Scales - filed by PT Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William Scales, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Czerwonka, Scott)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Order setting telephone conference [REVISED] re #8 Notice of Service, #7 Order Setting Teleconference, filed by PT Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Czerwonka, Scott)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher W. Cardwell filed by PT Network, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2019. (fms)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher W. Cardwell - filed by PT Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Christopher W. Cardwell, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Czerwonka, Scott)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Order setting telephone conference re #7 Order Setting Teleconference, filed by PT Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Czerwonka, Scott)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for plaintiff to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 9/5/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall provide notice of this order to all defendants for whom counsel has not yet entered their appearance and shall file the proof of service on the docket. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/28/2019. (nmf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #5 Opening Brief in Support, by PT Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Czerwonka, Scott)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PT Network, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Certificate of Service)(Czerwonka, Scott)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by PT Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Certificate of Service)(Czerwonka, Scott)
August 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 13, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Rosanna Badillo-Sanchez, Cleaning Services of Delaware, LLC and Michael Sanchez on 8/13/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by PT Network, LLC. (mal)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT- filed against Rosanna Badillo-Sanchez, Cleaning Services of Delaware, LLC, Michael Sanchez - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2707280.) - filed by PT Network, LLC.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PT Network, LLC v. Rosanna Badillo-Sanchez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosanna Badillo-Sanchez
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosanna Sanchez
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaning Services of Delaware, LLC
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosanna Badillo
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sanchez
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PT Network, LLC
Represented By: Scott B. Czerwonka
Represented By: Christopher W. Cardwell
Represented By: William Scales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?