RSB Spine, LLC v. DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: RSB Spine, LLC
Defendant: DePuy Synthes, Inc., DePuy Synthes Products, Inc. and DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01515
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy Synthes Products, Inc.- filed by RSB Spine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - H)(Phillips, John)
September 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas S. Koglman,Olivia B. Pedersen,Calvin P. Griffith for DePuy Synthes, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
September 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney T. Kaitlin Crowder for DePuy Synthes, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Patrick J. Norton for DePuy Synthes, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Calvin P. Griffith, Patrick J. Norton, T. Kaitlin Crowder, Thomas S. Koglman, and Olivia B. Pedersen, filed by DePuy Synthes, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2019. (nms)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Calvin P. Griffith, Patrick J. Norton, T. Kaitlin Crowder, Thomas S. Koglman, and Olivia B. Pedersen - filed by DePuy Synthes, Inc.. (Day, John)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to October 4, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: DePuy Synthes, Inc. answer due 10/4/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/3/2019. (nms)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to October 4, 2019 - filed by DePuy Synthes, Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Day on behalf of DePuy Synthes, Inc. (Day, John)
August 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Rose S. Whelan for RSB Spine, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Frank V. Pietrantonio, Erik B. Milch, Dustin M. Knight for RSB Spine, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik B. Milch, Dustin M. Knight, Frank V. Pietrantonio, Rose S. Whelan and Joseph M. Drayton, filed by RSB Spine, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/22/2019. (nms)
August 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik B. Milch, Dustin M. Knight, Frank V. Pietrantonio, Rose S. Whelan and Joseph M. Drayton - filed by RSB Spine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Erik B. Milch, #2 Certification of Dustin M. Knight, #3 Certification of Frank V. Pietrantonio, #4 Certification of Rose S. Whelan, #5 Certification of Joseph M. Drayton)(Bilson, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RSB Spine, LLC. DePuy Synthes, Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Phillips, John)
August 13, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to DePuy Synthes, Inc. on 8/13/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by RSB Spine, LLC. (kmd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,984,234; 9,713,537. (kmd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against DePuy Synthes, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2707472.) - filed by RSB Spine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RSB Spine, LLC v. DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RSB Spine, LLC
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Dustin M. Knight
Represented By: Frank V. Pietrantonio
Represented By: Rose S. Whelan
Represented By: Erik B. Milch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes, Inc.
Represented By: Olivia B. Pedersen
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: T. Kaitlin Crowder
Represented By: Calvin P. Griffith
Represented By: Patrick J. Norton
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Thomas S. Koglman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?