London v. Members of the Gender Dysphoria Consultation Group et al
Plaintiff: Kamilla London
Defendant: Sergeant Angelina DeAllie, Deputy Warden Philip Parker, Sergeant "John" Abernathy, Loretta Edwards, Members of the Gender Dysphoria Consultation Group, Warden Dana Metzger, Deputy Warden James Scarborough, Manager Tonya Smith, Marc Richman, Lieutenant Mark Daum, Captain "John" Cessna, Stacey Hollis, Lieutenant Matthew Stevenson, Robin O. Timme, Sergeant Jason Arrington, Paola A. Munoz, Officer Brent Dickerson, Bureau Chief Shane Troxler, Captain Ramon Taylor, Major John Brennan, Officer Megan McCarthy, Major Kevin Senato and Captain Randall Dotson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01518
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORAL ORDER - Having recognized the representation of Stephen B. Brauerman and Justin R. Alberto for Plaintiff and the stay having been lifted, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before 10/28/2019: (1) Plaintiff shall inform the Court whether she intends to rely on the original pro se complaint or file an Amended Complaint or (2) if Plaintiff intends to rely on the original pro se complaint, the parties shall file a proposed briefing schedule for the pending #3 motion to dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that should Plaintiff choose to file an Amended Complaint, that amendment shall be filed on or before 12/2/2019. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/7/2019. (dlw)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Court recognizes the agreement of representation by Stephen B. Brauerman and Justin R. Alberto for Kamilla London. Representation effective until final determination of case, unless otherwise ordered. The STAY is lifted. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/19/19. (rwc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 Letter to Judge Noreika from Kamilla London regarding D.I. #13 Order dated August 23, 2019. (amf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 Letter to Clerk's office from Kamilla London regarding Chancery Court filings. (Attachments: #1 Chancery Court filings) (lak)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - that: 1. Plaintiffs request for counsel is GRANTED. (D.I. #8 ).2. Plaintiffs motion for expedited proceedings is DENIED. (D.I. #11 ). 3. Plaintiffs motion for an extension of time to file a response/reply to Defendants motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to renew. (D.I. #12 ) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: 1. The Clerk of Court is directed to attempt to refer representation of Plaintiff to a member of the Federal Civil Panel. CASE STAYED. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/23/19. (rwc)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Kamilla London. (lak)
August 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Expedited Proceedings - filed by Kamilla London. (nmg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION re #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kamilla London. (nmg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of D.I. #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Kamilla London. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/3/2019. (nmg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Kamilla London. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(nmg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 REDACTED VERSION of #5 Exhibit to a Document,, by "John" Abernathy, Jason Arrington, John Brennan, "John" Cessna, Mark Daum, Angelina DeAllie, Brent Dickerson, Randall Dotson, Loretta Edwards, Stacey Hollis, Megan McCarthy, Dana Metzger, Philip Parker, Marc Richman, Kevin Senato, Tonya Smith, Matthew Stevenson, Ramon Taylor, Shane Troxler. (Lees, George)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 REDACTED VERSION of #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Settlement and Release, Statute of Limitations and Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies by "John" Abernathy, Jason Arrington, John Brennan, "John" Cessna, Mark Daum, Angelina DeAllie, Brent Dickerson, Randall Dotson, Loretta Edwards, Stacey Hollis, Megan McCarthy, Dana Metzger, Philip Parker, Marc Richman, Kevin Senato, Tonya Smith, Matthew Stevenson, Ramon Taylor, Shane Troxler. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lees, George)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Settlement and Release, Statute of Limitations and Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies by "John" Abernathy, Jason Arrington, John Brennan, "John" Cessna, Mark Daum, Angelina DeAllie, Brent Dickerson, Randall Dotson, Loretta Edwards, Stacey Hollis, Megan McCarthy, Dana Metzger, Philip Parker, Marc Richman, Kevin Senato, Tonya Smith, Matthew Stevenson, Ramon Taylor, Shane Troxler. (Lees, George)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Settlement and Release, Statute of Limitations and Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies by "John" Abernathy, Jason Arrington, John Brennan, "John" Cessna, Mark Daum, Angelina DeAllie, Brent Dickerson, Randall Dotson, Loretta Edwards, Stacey Hollis, Megan McCarthy, Dana Metzger, Philip Parker, Marc Richman, Kevin Senato, Tonya Smith, Matthew Stevenson, Ramon Taylor, Shane Troxler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit C - Stipulation of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit D - Chancery Court Docket, #4 Exhibit E - Grievances, #5 Exhibit F - DOC Policy 8.60A, #6 Exhibit G - DOC Policy 4.4, #7 Exhibit H - BCHS Policy A-11, #8 Exhibit I - Biggins v. Addogoh)(Lees, George)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 [SEALED] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Settlement and Release, Statute of Limitations and Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies - filed by "John" Abernathy, Jason Arrington, John Brennan, "John" Cessna, Mark Daum, Angelina DeAllie, Brent Dickerson, Randall Dotson, Loretta Edwards, Stacey Hollis, Megan McCarthy, Dana Metzger, Philip Parker, Marc Richman, Kevin Senato, Tonya Smith, Matthew Stevenson, Ramon Taylor, Shane Troxler. (Lees, George)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware, Case Number 2019-0513-SG (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2707903)- filed by Brent Dickerson, Shane Troxler, Matthew Stevenson, Ramon Taylor, "John" Abernathy, Tonya Smith, Jason Arrington, Kevin Senato, Randall Dotson, Stacey Hollis, Megan McCarthy, Dana Metzger, Philip Parker, John Brennan, "John" Cessna, Mark Daum, Loretta Edwards, Angelina DeAllie, and Marc Richman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: London v. Members of the Gender Dysphoria Consultation Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Angelina DeAllie
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Philip Parker
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant "John" Abernathy
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Edwards
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Members of the Gender Dysphoria Consultation Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Dana Metzger
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden James Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manager Tonya Smith
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Richman
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Mark Daum
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain "John" Cessna
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Hollis
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Matthew Stevenson
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin O. Timme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Jason Arrington
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paola A. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Brent Dickerson
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau Chief Shane Troxler
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Ramon Taylor
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major John Brennan
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Megan McCarthy
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Kevin Senato
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Randall Dotson
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamilla London
Represented By: Justin R. Alberto
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?