Reply SpA v. Sensoria Inc et al
Plaintiff: Reply SpA
Defendant: Sensoria Holdings Ltd, Maurizio Macagno, Sensoria Inc and Dr. Davide Vigano
Case Number: 1:2019cv01524
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 36 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/16/2019. (lak)
August 15, 2019 Filing 35 Record of case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number in Other District: 2:19-cv-00450. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
July 30, 2019 Case will be sent to the U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware by electronic transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' #22 Motion to Dismiss. Counts One, Two, and Three are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. This lawsuit is STAYED pending the resolution of Counts One, Two, and Three or until further motion of either of the parties. The parties are ORDERED to notify the Court when Counts One, Two, and Three are resolved. The status conference, currently set for 8/6/2019 (Dkt. No. #25 ), is VACATED. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY, filed by Defendants Maurizio Macagno, Sensoria Holdings Ltd, Sensoria Inc, Davide Vigano, TO RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b) (Vail, Patrick) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Reply SpA, to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b). (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER re Defendants' #22 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b). The parties are ORDERED to submit their supplemental briefs no later than 7/17/2019. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-note Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #22 ) to 7/17/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 30 PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe) signature page re #28 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendants Maurizio Macagno, Sensoria Holdings Ltd, Sensoria Inc, Davide Vigano (Vail, Patrick) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
June 10, 2019 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #28 Reply to Response to Motion was improperly signed by Patrick Vail. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Defendants Maurizio Macagno, Sensoria Holdings Ltd, Sensoria Inc, Davide Vigano re #28 Reply to Response to Motion (Vail, Patrick) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY, filed by Defendants Maurizio Macagno, Sensoria Holdings Ltd, Sensoria Inc, Davide Vigano, TO RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b) (Vail, Patrick) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Reply SpA, to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b). (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Patrick Vail for Defendants Maurizio Macagno, Sensoria Holdings Ltd, Sensoria Inc, Davide Vigano from July 4 - July 11 2019. (Vail, Patrick) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #24 Stipulated Motion: Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #22 ) is EXTENDED to 6/3/2019. The deadline for Defendants' reply to Plaintiff's response is 6/7/2019. Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #22 ) is re-noted for 6/7/2019. The status conference is EXTENDED to 8/6/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(MW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 24 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Extend Plaintiff Reply SPA's Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Reschedule the July 9, 2019 Status Conference, filed by Plaintiff Reply SpA. Noting Date 5/9/2019, (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Defendants Maurizio Macagno, Sensoria Holdings Ltd, Sensoria Inc, Davide Vigano re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b) (Vail, Patrick) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b), filed by Defendants Maurizio Macagno, Sensoria Holdings Ltd, Sensoria Inc, Davide Vigano. Noting Date 5/17/2019, (Vail, Patrick) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Patrick Vail. Filed by Defendants Maurizio Macagno, Sensoria Holdings Ltd, Sensoria Inc, Davide Vigano. (Vail, Patrick) Modified address on 4/9/2019 (DS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Maurizio Macagno, Sensoria Holdings Ltd, Sensoria Inc, Davide Vigano (Vail, Patrick) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patrick Vail on behalf of Defendants Maurizio Macagno, Sensoria Holdings Ltd, Sensoria Inc, Davide Vigano. (Vail, Patrick) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Sensoria Holdings Ltd on 4/2/2019, filed by Plaintiff Reply SpA. (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Reply SpA re #6 Praecipe for a Summons Declaration of Service of Summons re Sensoria Inc (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Reply SpA re #3 Praecipe for a Summons Declaration of Service re Dr. Davide Vigano (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Reply SpA re #4 Praecipe for a Summons Declaration of Service re Maurizio Macagno (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 7/9/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Maurizio Macagno, Sensoria Holdings Ltd, Sensoria Inc, Davide Vigano (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Reply S.P.A. (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Maria Z Vathis for Reply S.P.A., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Demetria L Hamilton for Reply S.P.A., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Maria Z. Vathis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Reply S.P.A. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5704935 (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Demetria Hamilton FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Reply S.P.A. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5704888 (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Summons to Sensoria Inc. by Plaintiff Reply S.P.A. (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Summons to Sensoria Holdings LTD by Plaintiff Reply S.P.A. (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Summons to Maurizio Macagno by Plaintiff Reply S.P.A. (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Summons re Dr. Davide Vigano by Plaintiff Reply S.P.A. (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Reply S.P.A.. (Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5704830) Attorney Jessica Walder added to party Reply S.P.A.(pty:pla), filed by Reply S.P.A..(Walder, Jessica) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reply SpA v. Sensoria Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sensoria Holdings Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurizio Macagno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sensoria Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Davide Vigano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reply SpA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?