Moncada v. Lendmark Financial Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mercedes Moncada
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Lendmark Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01561
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 24, 2019 filed by Lendmark Financial Services, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Lendmark Financial Services, Inc. answer due 10/24/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/23/2019. (fms)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 24, 2019 - filed by Lendmark Financial Services, Inc.. (Moskow-Schnoll, Beth)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to October 18, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/20/2019. (fms)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to October 18, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mercedes Moncada. Lendmark Financial Services, Inc. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mercedes Moncada. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
August 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 22, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC and Lendmark Financial Services, Inc. on 8/22/2019. (Summons mailed to counsel's Philadelphia office). (mal)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, and Lendmark Financial Services, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2714037.) - filed by Mercedes Moncada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moncada v. Lendmark Financial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lendmark Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Beth Moskow-Schnoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Moncada
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?