InterDigital Technology Corporation et al v. Lenovo Holding Co. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: InterDigital, Inc., InterDigital Holdings, Inc., IPR Licensing, Inc., InterDigital Technology Corporation and InterDigital Communications, Inc.
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Holding Company Inc. and Motorola Mobility LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01590
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 4, 2019 filed by Lenovo Holding Company Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Lenovo (United States) Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/18/19. (ntl)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 4, 2019 - filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Holding Company Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 24, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Maura L. Rees, David S. Steuer, Ryan R. Smith, Michael B. Levin for IPR Licensing, Inc., InterDigital Communications, Inc., InterDigital Holdings, Inc., InterDigital Technology Corporation and InterDigital, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David S. Steuer, Michael B. Levin, Maura L. Rees, and Ryan R. Smith filed by InterDigital Communications, Inc., InterDigital Technology Corporation, InterDigital, Inc., InterDigital Holdings, Inc., IPR Licensing, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/20/19. (ntl)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David S. Steuer, Michael B. Levin, Maura L. Rees, and Ryan R. Smith - filed by IPR Licensing, Inc., InterDigital Communications, Inc., InterDigital Holdings, Inc., InterDigital Technology Corporation, InterDigital, Inc.. (Swadley, Beth)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to respond to the Complaint to October 18, 2019 filed by Lenovo Holding Company Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Lenovo (United States) Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/12/19. (ntl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to respond to the Complaint to October 18, 2019 - filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Holding Company Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by InterDigital Communications, Inc., InterDigital, Inc., InterDigital Technology Corporation, InterDigital Holdings, Inc., IPR Licensing, Inc.. Motorola Mobility LLC served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Belgam, Neal)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by InterDigital Communications, Inc., InterDigital, Inc., InterDigital Technology Corporation, InterDigital Holdings, Inc., IPR Licensing, Inc.. Lenovo (United States) Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Belgam, Neal)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by InterDigital Communications, Inc., InterDigital, Inc., InterDigital Technology Corporation, InterDigital Holdings, Inc., IPR Licensing, Inc.. Lenovo Holding Company Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Belgam, Neal)
August 28, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Holding Company Inc. and Motorola Mobility LLC on 8/28/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent InterDigital Holdings, Inc. for IPR Licensing, Inc., and InterDigital Technology Corporation; Corporate Parent InterDigital Wireless, Inc. for InterDigital Communications, Inc., and InterDigital Holdings, Inc. filed by IPR Licensing, Inc., InterDigital Communications, Inc., InterDigital Holdings, Inc., InterDigital Technology Corporation, InterDigital, Inc.. (mal)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) SEE ATTACHED. (mal)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Holding Company Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2717581.) - filed by InterDigital Communications, Inc., InterDigital, Inc., InterDigital Technology Corporation, InterDigital Holdings, Inc., IPR Licensing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InterDigital Technology Corporation et al v. Lenovo Holding Co. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo Holding Company Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterDigital, Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Beth Ann Swadley
Represented By: David S. Steuer
Represented By: Ryan R. Smith
Represented By: Maura L. Rees
Represented By: Michael B. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterDigital Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Beth Ann Swadley
Represented By: David S. Steuer
Represented By: Ryan R. Smith
Represented By: Maura L. Rees
Represented By: Michael B. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPR Licensing, Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Beth Ann Swadley
Represented By: David S. Steuer
Represented By: Ryan R. Smith
Represented By: Maura L. Rees
Represented By: Michael B. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterDigital Technology Corporation
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Beth Ann Swadley
Represented By: David S. Steuer
Represented By: Ryan R. Smith
Represented By: Maura L. Rees
Represented By: Michael B. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterDigital Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Beth Ann Swadley
Represented By: David S. Steuer
Represented By: Ryan R. Smith
Represented By: Maura L. Rees
Represented By: Michael B. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?