The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters et al v. Potter et al
Plaintiff: The Institutes, LLC and The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters
Defendant: Adam Potter and Business Insurance Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01600
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew P. Cooper for Business Insurance Holdings, LLC and Adam Potter added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Erik M. Bashian for Business Insurance Holdings, LLC and Adam Potter added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew P. Cooper, Esquire - filed by Business Insurance Holdings, LLC, Adam Potter. (Donimirski, Melissa)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik M. Bashian, Esquire - filed by Business Insurance Holdings, LLC, Adam Potter. (Donimirski, Melissa)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Business Insurance Holdings, LLC, Adam Potter. (Donimirski, Melissa)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney David J. Walton for The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters and The Institutes, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Corporate Parent Moxie HC, LLC for Business Insurance Holdings, LLC. (fms)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik M. Bashian, Esquire filed by Business Insurance Holdings, LLC, Adam Potter, #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew P. Cooper, Esquire filed by Business Insurance Holdings, LLC, Adam Potter. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/7/2019. (fms)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew J. Siegel for The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters, for The Institutes, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Business Insurance Holdings, LLC, Adam Potter. (Donimirski, Melissa)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to October 31, 2019 - filed by Business Insurance Holdings, LLC, Adam Potter. (Donimirski, Melissa)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to October 31, 2019 filed by Business Insurance Holdings, LLC, Adam Potter, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Business Insurance Holdings, LLC answer due 10/31/2019; Adam Potter answer due 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/4/2019. (fms)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Other Affiliate Moxie HC, LLC for Business Insurance Holdings, LLC. (fms)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski on behalf of Business Insurance Holdings, LLC, Adam Potter (Donimirski, Melissa)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt M. Heyman on behalf of Business Insurance Holdings, LLC, Adam Potter (Heyman, Kurt)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J. Walton filed by The Institutes, LLC, The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters, #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew J. Siegel filed by The Institutes, LLC, The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/3/2019. (fms)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J. Walton - filed by The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters, The Institutes, LLC. (Klayman, Barry)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew J. Siegel - filed by The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters, The Institutes, LLC. (Klayman, Barry)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters, The Institutes, LLC. Adam Potter served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Klayman, Barry)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters, The Institutes, LLC. Business Insurance Holdings, LLC served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Klayman, Barry)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters, The Institutes, LLC. (Klayman, Barry)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Business Insurance Holdings, LLC and Adam Potter on 8/29/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Business Insurance Holdings, LLC and Adam Potter - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2718684.) - filed by The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters and The Institutes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters et al v. Potter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Institutes, LLC
Represented By: Barry M. Klayman
Represented By: Matthew J. Siegel
Represented By: David J. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The American Institute for Chartered Property Casualty Underwriters
Represented By: Barry M. Klayman
Represented By: Matthew J. Siegel
Represented By: David J. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Potter
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Represented By: Erik M. Bashian
Represented By: Andrew P. Cooper
Represented By: Kurt M. Heyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Insurance Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Represented By: Erik M. Bashian
Represented By: Andrew P. Cooper
Represented By: Kurt M. Heyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?