Tanjavoor v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Susheel Tanjavoor
Defendant: H. James Williams, William Norris Jennings, Michael Dinkins, K. Ranga Krishnan, James S. Ely, III, Julia B. North, Tim L. Hingtgen, Thomas J. Aaron, John A. Clerico, W. Larry Cash, Wayne T. Smith, Kevin J. Hammons and John A. Fry
Nominal Defendant: Community Health Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01617
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SO ORDERED, re #19 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Limited Stay of Proceedings filed by John A. Clerico, Julia B. North, John A. Fry, Thomas J. Aaron, James S. Ely, III, H. James Williams, William Norris Jennings, Michael Dinkins, K. Ranga Krishnan, Community Health Systems, Inc., W. Larry Cash, Tim L. Hingtgen, Kevin J. Hammons, Wayne T. Smith. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/2/2019. (fms)
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Limited Stay of Proceedings by Thomas J. Aaron, W. Larry Cash, John A. Clerico, Community Health Systems, Inc., Michael Dinkins, James S. Ely, III, John A. Fry, Kevin J. Hammons, Tim L. Hingtgen, William Norris Jennings, K. Ranga Krishnan, Julia B. North, Wayne T. Smith, H. James Williams. (Will, Lori)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Robert Liston on behalf of All Defendants (Liston, Ian)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori W. Will on behalf of Thomas J. Aaron, W. Larry Cash, John A. Clerico, Community Health Systems, Inc., Michael Dinkins, James S. Ely, III, John A. Fry, Kevin J. Hammons, Tim L. Hingtgen, William Norris Jennings, K. Ranga Krishnan, Julia B. North, Wayne T. Smith, H. James Williams (Will, Lori)
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. K. Ranga Krishnan served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. William Norris Jennings served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. John A. Fry served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. James S. Ely, III served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. Michael Dinkins served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. John A. Clerico served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. Tim L. Hingtgen served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. Wayne T. Smith served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. W. Larry Cash served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. Thomas J. Aaron served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. Kevin J. Hammons served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. Julia B. North served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. H. James Williams served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susheel Tanjavoor. Community Health Systems, Inc. served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 30, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Thomas J. Aaron on 8/30/2019; W. Larry Cash on 8/30/2019; John A. Clerico on 8/30/2019; Community Health Systems, Inc. on 8/30/2019; Michael Dinkins on 8/30/2019; James S. Ely, III on 8/30/2019; John A. Fry on 8/30/2019; Kevin J. Hammons on 8/30/2019; Tim L. Hingtgen on 8/30/2019; William Norris Jennings on 8/30/2019; K. Ranga Krishnan on 8/30/2019; Julia B. North on 8/30/2019; Wayne T. Smith on 8/30/2019; H. James Williams on 8/30/2019. (sam)
August 30, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Stockholder Derivative COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Thomas J. Aaron, W. Larry Cash, John A. Clerico, Community Health Systems, Inc., Michael Dinkins, James S. Ely, III, John A. Fry, Kevin J. Hammons, Tim L. Hingtgen, William Norris Jennings, K. Ranga Krishnan, Julia B. North, Wayne T. Smith, H. James Williams - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2719906.) - filed by Susheel Tanjavoor. (Attachments: #1 Verification to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanjavoor v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. James Williams
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Norris Jennings
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dinkins
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Ranga Krishnan
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Ely, III
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia B. North
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim L. Hingtgen
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Aaron
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Clerico
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Larry Cash
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne T. Smith
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. Hammons
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Fry
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susheel Tanjavoor
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Community Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?